New York Southern District Court
Judge:Nelson Stephen Roman
Case #: 7:24-cv-09881
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2024
Terminated:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 5:56 AM EST
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Patrick Lee Wright
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Christopher Barry Turcotte
Turcotte Law, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Avrum Schwartz
Represented By
Rami Salim
Stein Saks PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
23 23 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 04/22 12:53 PM
JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the Plaintiff and the Defendant, Experian Information Solutions, Inc, that whereas no party hereto is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, that this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/22/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/18 10:46 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 22 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety; the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal in a closed case. (tp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
22 22 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 04/17 5:36 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Experian Information Solutions, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Avrum Schwartz. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order of Discontinuance Tue 04/15 4:28 PM
ORDER: The Court having been informed that the Plaintiff and Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. have settled this matter, it is hereby ORDERED, that the above-entitled action be and hereby is discontinued, subject to reopening should the agreement not be consummated within sixty (60) days of the date hereof. The parties are advised that if they wish the Court to retain jurisdiction in this matter for purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the agreement to the Court within the next 60 days with a request that the agreement be "so ordered" by the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/15/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 04/15 1:59 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AS TO CHASE ONLY: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for plaintiff Avrum Schwartz ("Schwartz") and defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. ("Chase") that, pursuant to FRCP 41(a), all of the claims by Schwartz against Chase in the captioned matter are hereby discontinued in their entirety, with prejudice, and without costs to either party. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Defendant JP Morgan Chase from the instant action. SO ORDERED. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. terminated. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/15/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/14 11:07 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 19 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (nd)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
19 19 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/11 3:24 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and without costs. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. ..(Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
18 18 4 pgs order Order Fri 04/11 12:19 PM
ORDER : The Court is in receipt of Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank and Defendant Experian Information Solutions respective answers (ECF No. 15, 16) to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. 1). Plaintiff and Defendant Experian have reached a settlement on March 27, 2025 (ECF No. 17). The Court waives the Initial Pre-trial Conference and directs the parties to jointly complete a Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order (blank form attached hereto). Said Scheduling Order shall be filed on the docket by May 2, 2025. After review and approval of the Scheduling Order, the Court will issue an Order of Reference to Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy for general pretrial purposes. The parties are directed to contact Judge McCarthy within seven (7) business days of the date of the Order of Reference to schedule a conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/11/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 03/27 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. . Document filed by Avrum Schwartz..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/27 11:14 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Wright, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/29 2:53 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/29 2:50 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/29 2:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Barry Turcotte on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 01/21 11:29 AM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time The Court GRANTS Defendant Experian's consented-to request for a 30-day extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 28, 2025. The Clerk of Court is kindly directed to terminate the motion at ECF. No. 11. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 1/21/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 01/21 11:30 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 2/28/2025. (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
11 11 1 pgs motion Extension of Time Fri 01/17 2:31 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Patrick L. Wright dated January 17, 2025. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Wright, Patrick)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/17 2:27 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Wright, Patrick)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/17 2:23 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Lee Wright on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Wright, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/09 1:02 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 1/8/2025, answer due 1/29/2025. Service was accepted by Mohamed Dansoko. Document filed by Avrum Schwartz..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/09 12:59 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 1/8/2025, answer due 1/29/2025. Service was accepted by Mohamed Dansoko. Document filed by Avrum Schwartz..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Fri 12/27 12:56 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Philip M. Halpern is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 12/26 4:31 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 12/26 4:30 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A...(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 12/26 9:14 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 12/26 9:14 AM
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 12/26 9:14 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Thu 12/26 2:54 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 12/23 11:23 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Avrum Schwartz..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 12/23 11:23 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Avrum Schwartz..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 12/23 11:22 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/23 11:21 AM
COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30372465)Document filed by Avrum Schwartz..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]