Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Arthur J Schwab
Case #: 2:24-cv-01746
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2024
Terminated:Jan 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 6:51 AM EST
Defendant
RAHAL BIOSCIENCES, INC.
Plaintiff
BLAIR DOUGLASS
Represented By
Kevin W. Tucker
East End Trial Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, January 17, 2025
4 4 order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 01/17 4:28 PM
TEXT ORDER approving3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by BLAIR DOUGLASS. Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 1/17/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lar)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Atty) Fri 01/17 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by BLAIR DOUGLASS (Tucker, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 12/23 4:56 PM
Summons Issued as to RAHAL BIOSCIENCES, INC. (jkn)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required) Mon 12/23 1:31 PM
COMPLAINT against RAHAL BIOSCIENCES, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8620713), filed by BLAIR DOUGLASS. (Tucker, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 12/23 4:55 PM
Judge Arthur J. Schwab added. (jkn)
Related: [-]