Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:24-bk-90621

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Alfredo R Perez
Case #: 4:24-ap-03273
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 1:26 PM CDT
Counter-Claimant
Party City Holdco, Inc.
Counter-Defendant
Gwendolyn Hanlon
Defendant
Party City Holdco, Inc.
Represented By
Party City Holdco, Inc.
contact info
Megan Young-John
Porter Hedges LLP
contact info
John F Higgins, IV
Porter Hedges LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gwendolyn Hanlon
Represented By
Walter J Cicack
Hawash Cicack & Gaston LLP
contact info
Jack A. Raisner
Raisner Roupinian LLP
contact info
Gwendolyn Hanlon
contact info
Rene S. Roupinian
Raisner Roupinian LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
62 62 6 pgs motion Generic Motion (Adversary) Wed 04/30 10:36 AM
Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Filed by Gwendolyn Hanlon (Raisner, Jack)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
61 61 audio MP3 Tue 04/29 3:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/29/2025 3:04:18 PM ]. File Size [ 7056 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:14:42 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
60 60 court Courtroom Minutes Tue 04/29 3:23 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 3:00 PM to 3:19 PM. Appearances: see log. Additional appearances: Jack Raisner. Argument heard. Status Conference held. The Court purpose for todays hearing is to set a timeline for the class action certification, discuss the Motion for Summary Judgement, and enter a scheduling order. Ms. Young-John provides the court with a case update. Plaintiffs are seeking to file a motion to file an amended complaint. The debtor/defendant is seeking a 45 day pause on the outstanding Motion for Summary Judgement28 . Mr. Raisner addresses the court in support of Ms. Young-John. Ms. Alwen does not have a position with the matters brough before the court today. The Court finds the 45-day pause will be imposed and Mr. Raiser may file his motion to file an amended complaint. The status conference is continued to 6/13/2025 at 10:00 AM CST virtually. ERO: yes. Related [+]. Status Conference scheduled for 6/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at telephone and video conference. (abm4)Modified on 4/29/2025 (abm4)
Related: [-] 25 Generic Application
Saturday, April 26, 2025
59 59 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/26 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 58 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, April 24, 2025
58 58 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 04/24 2:53 PM
Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceedings (Case No. 24-03273 ECF NO. 19; Case No. 24-03277 ECF No. 30) Related [+], Signed on 4/24/2025. (abm4)
Related: [-] 19
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
57 57 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/23 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 56 Generic Order