Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Roy K Altman
Referred: Enjolique A Lett
Case #: 1:24-cv-25063
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 6:27 AM EST
Defendant
Dobbs Equipment, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Mitchell Goodz
Mcguinness & Cicero
contact info
Plaintiff
Ana Delgado
Represented By
Stephanie Therese Nunez
Rodriguez Tramont & Nunez, P.A.
contact info
Paul Michael Nunez
contact info
Andrew Tramont, Jr.
Rodriguez Tramont & Nunez
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jose Lopez
Terminated: 01/21/2025
Represented By
Andrew Michael Gordon
Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP
contact info
Lauren Dale Swanson
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
39 39 2 pgs adr Mediation Report Mon 05/05 2:52 PM
MEDIATION REPORT held before Mediator Denise Wheeler Wright. Prepared by: Jeffrey M. Goodz, Esq.. Filed by Dobbs Equipment, LLC. Disposition: Case did not settle. Mediation held/partially held via video-conference. (Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
38 38 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Tue 04/01 2:15 PM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Mediator Denise Wheeler Wright. Mediation Hearing set for 5/2/2025 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/1/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
37 37 2 pgs notice Notice of Compliance Mon 03/31 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Compliance JOINT NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH ORDER FOLLOWING HEARING by Ana Delgado, Dobbs Equipment, LLC re36 Order (Tramont, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
36 36 2 pgs order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 03/20 3:55 PM
ORDER FOLLOWING HEARING re 35 Status Conference. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 3/20/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
35 35 minutes Status Conference Wed 03/19 8:36 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roy K. Altman: Status Conference held on 3/18/2025. Total time in court: 9 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Jeffrey Mitchell Goodz, Andrew Tramont, Jr. Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 305-301-3276 / mjsfcs@aol.com. (es00)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
34 34 2 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing Wed 03/12 6:08 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCES . The cases listed below are SET for a status conference on March 18, 2025, at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 3/12/2025. See attached document for full details. (cps)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
33 33 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Wed 02/19 1:25 PM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Mediator Denise Wheeler Wright. Mediation Hearing set for 8/20/2025 09:00 AM Via Videoconference. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/18/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF Tue 02/18 10:58 AM
Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Denise Wheeler Wright. (Tramont, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
31 31 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Tue 02/18 9:31 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re30 Notice (Other). Parties/Mediator Not Added ; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties/mediator. (drz)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/14 4:38 PM
Joint NOTICE OF SELECTION OF MEDIATOR by Ana Delgado (Tramont, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, February 06, 2025
29 29 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/06 2:52 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Dobbs Equipment, LLC identifying Corporate Parent DJD Equipment Holdings, LLC for Dobbs Equipment, LLC (Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
28 28 18 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 02/04 3:15 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Dobbs Equipment, LLC. (Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
27 27 9 pgs order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 01/31 10:50 AM
ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES Signed by Magistrate Judge Enjolique A. Lett on 1/31/2025. See attached document for full details. (mwn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
26 26 6 pgs order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Order Referring Case to Mediation Thu 01/30 4:21 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 1/26/2026 in Miami Division before Judge Roy K. Altman., Calendar Call set for 1/20/2026 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Roy K. Altman.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Enjolique A. Lett for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 10/14/2025.) Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/29/2025. See attached document for full details. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
25 25 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 01/29 11:13 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING the Defendant's23 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Certificate of Interested Parties. The Defendant must file its certificate of interested parties by February 7, 2025 . Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/29/2025. (es00)
Related: [-]
24 24 3 pgs misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/29 10:56 AM
Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dobbs Equipment, LLC identifying Corporate Parent DJD Equipment Holdings, LLC for Dobbs Equipment, LLC (Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
23 23 4 pgs motion Extension of Time Wed 01/29 10:52 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Certificate of Interested Parties re15 Order by Dobbs Equipment, LLC. Responses due by 2/12/2025.(Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Certificate of Interested Parties
22 22 2 pgs misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/29 10:08 AM
Certificate of Other Affiliates INTERESTED PERSONS by ANA DELGADO (Tramont, Andrew)
Related: [-]
21 21 7 pgs misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Wed 01/29 9:13 AM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Dobbs Equipment, LLC(Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order Proposed Joint Scheduling Order
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
20 20 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 01/21 1:34 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER DISMISSING Defendant. The Plaintiff has19 amended her complaint to drop Defendant Jose Lopez. The only Defendant left in the Amended Complaint is Dobbs Equipment, LLC. We therefore dismiss Defendant Jose Lopez from this action without prejudice . Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/21/2025. (es00)
Related: [-]
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Tue 01/21 10:51 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dobbs Equipment, LLC, filed by ANA DELGADO.(Tramont, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue
Friday, January 17, 2025
18 18 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 01/17 11:26 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER DENYING as moot the Defendants'16 Renewed Joint Motion to Separately Answer or Respond to the1 Complaint. The Defendants have informed us that they now have an actual conflict: Defendant Lopez wants to move to dismiss the Complaint, while Defendant Dobbs Equipment, LLC wants to answer the Complaint. Mot. at 2. We agree that these positions are "fundamentally distinct" and that "Lopez cannot answer the Complaint while simultaneously seeking dismissal of the claims against him." Ibid. Our Multiple Defendants Order isn't to the contrary. Dobbs Equipment, LLC may answer the Complaint and Lopez may move to dismiss it. Their deadline to do so remains January 21, 2025 . Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/17/2025. (es00)
Related: [-]
17 17 3 pgs notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 01/17 11:11 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Mitchell Goodz on behalf of Dobbs Equipment, LLC. Attorney Jeffrey Mitchell Goodz added to party Dobbs Equipment, LLC(pty:dft). (Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
16 16 motion Leave to File Document Thu 01/16 6:20 PM
Renewed MOTION for Leave to File To File Separate Responses to the Complaint (JOINT) by JOSE LOPEZ.(Swanson, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
15 15 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 01/16 1:47 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/16/2025. See attached document for full details. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
14 14 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 01/15 7:39 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER DENYING the Defendants'13 Joint Motion for Leave to File Separate Responses. The Defendants tell us that "there's no current conflict" between them. Mot. at 2. "[I]n an abundance of caution," though, they ask us to let them respond separately because Defendant Dobbs Equipment, LLC plans to raise an argument that's not available to Defendant Lopez (one of its supervisors), and vice versa. Ibid. Dobbs plans to argue that it's not a covered employer under Title VII?an argument Lopez obviously can't raise as to himself?and Lopez plans to argue that there's no individual liability for him under Title VII?an argument Dobbs obviously can't raise as to itself. Id. at 2-3. Despite beginning by telling us that "there's no current conflict," the Defendants conclude that these defendant-specific arguments show that they do "have a conflict in how they can, intend to, and likely will respond to the Complaint." Id. at 3. The Defendants' first instinct was right?there's no conflict here. That Dobbs isn't covered by Title VII doesn't make Lopez any more liable, and that Lopez can't be sued under the statute doesn't make Dobbs any more liable. Rather, if the Defendants' arguments are correct, the Complaint must be dismissed. So, they're entirely able to file a joint brief in which they simply specify which arguments apply to only one Defendant. That brief remains due on January 21, 2025 . Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/15/2025. (es00)
Related: [-]
13 13 4 pgs motion Leave to File Document Wed 01/15 9:50 AM
Joint MOTION for Leave to File Separate Responses to the Complaint by JOSE LOPEZ.(Swanson, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, January 09, 2025
12 12 1 pgs notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 01/09 5:33 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Michael Gordon on behalf of JOSE LOPEZ. Attorney Andrew Michael Gordon added to party JOSE LOPEZ(pty:dft). (Gordon, Andrew)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 01/09 5:26 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Dale Swanson on behalf of JOSE LOPEZ. Attorney Lauren Dale Swanson added to party JOSE LOPEZ(pty:dft). (Swanson, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
10 10 2 pgs service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Fri 01/03 10:46 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by ANA DELGADO. Dobbs Equipment, LLC served on 12/31/2024, response/answer due 1/21/2025. (Tramont, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
9 9 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 01/02 11:28 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by ANA DELGADO. JOSE LOPEZ served on 12/28/2024, response/answer due 1/21/2025. (Tramont, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 12/31 12:40 PM
ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/31/2024. See attached document for full details. (cds)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 12/27 3:04 PM
Summons Issued as to Dobbs Equipment, LLC, JOSE LOPEZ. (drz)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Fri 12/27 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) JOSE LOPEZ by ANA DELGADO re1 Complaint filed by ANA DELGADO (Tramont, Andrew)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Fri 12/27 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) TO DOBBS EQUIPMENT by ANA DELGADO re1 Complaint filed by ANA DELGADO (Tramont, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Thu 12/26 10:16 AM
NOTICE CIVIL COVER SHEET by ANA DELGADO re 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case,1 Complaint (Tramont, Andrew)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Thu 12/26 9:40 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (drz)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 12/26 9:39 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Enjolique A. Lett is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/23 2:28 PM
COMPLAINT against ANA DELGADO. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18074086, filed by ANA DELGADO.(Tramont, Andrew)
Related: [-]