Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Eli J Richardson
Referred: Jeffery S Frensley
Case #: 3:24-cv-01494
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 5:53 AM CST
Defendant
Acadia Healthcare
Represented By
James A. Crumlin, Jr.
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Defendant
Acadia Management Company, LLC
Represented By
James A. Crumlin, Jr.
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tammy Harper
Represented By
Jillianne Rosemary Jerkins
Jerkins Law, Pllc.
contact info
Lucas E. W. Jerkins
Jerkins Law, Pllc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
17 17 5 pgs order Order Setting Case for Trial Wed 04/23 8:38 AM
ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 10/27/2026 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5C before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2026 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5C before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Exhibit List due by 10/12/2026. Witness List due by 10/12/2026. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/12/2026. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 04/22/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 04/01 9:14 AM
Set Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 11/3/2025 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
16 16 order Case Management Order Thu 03/27 3:36 PM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/20/2025. Discovery due by 12/1/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 6/8/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 03/27/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
minutes Case Management Conference by Telephone Wed 03/26 12:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 3/25/2025. (Hearing lasted :15)(sm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
15 15 misc Proposed Case Management Order Thu 03/20 4:37 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Acadia Healthcare, Acadia Management Company, LLC. (Walker, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 02/14 9:18 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for James A. Crumlin, Jr, Kristen J. Walker admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/13 10:52 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Acadia Healthcare, Acadia Management Company, LLC.(Crumlin, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
13 13 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 01/24 1:02 PM
ORDER: Motion12 for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint GRANTED. Acadia Healthcare answer due 2/13/2025; Acadia Management Company, LLC answer due 2/13/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 01/24/2025. (ad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 01/23 2:31 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Acadia Healthcare, Acadia Management Company, LLC. (Crumlin, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/22 2:40 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Tammy Harper. (Jerkins, Jillianne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/16 3:00 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Tammy Harper. Acadia Management Company, LLC served on 1/2/2025. (Jerkins, Jillianne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
9 9 2 pgs order Order Thu 01/02 8:26 AM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 01/02/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 12/26 4:11 PM
Summons issued as to Acadia Healthcare Company, LLC, Acadia Management Company, LLC. (ad)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Summons to be Issued Mon 12/23 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to ACADIA HEALTHCARE COMPANY, INC.. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (Jerkins, Jillianne)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Summons to be Issued Mon 12/23 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to ACADIA MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC.. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (Jerkins, Jillianne)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Mon 12/23 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 3/25/2025 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ab)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Mon 12/23 1:23 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ab)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Mon 12/23 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ab)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Mon 12/23 1:13 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ab)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/23 1:12 PM
COMPLAINT against Acadia Healthcare, Acadia Management Company, LLC (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4226440), filed by Tammy Harper.(ab)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EEOC Right to Sue Letter,
Att: 2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Mon 12/23 1:25 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Lucas E. W. Jerkins, Jillianne Rosemary Jerkins admitted to this court . (ab)
Related: [-]