Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael J Truncale
Case #: 1:24-cv-00522
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2024
Terminated:Feb 04, 2025
Case in other court:58th District Court of Jefferson County, 24DCCV2272
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 4:44 AM CST
Defendant
Ergon Trucking, Inc.,
Represented By
Jose Manuel Luzarraga
Butler Snow Llp Dallas
contact info
Plaintiff
Ernest Elgin Jackson
Represented By
Robert Carl Hilliard
Hilliard Law
contact info
Thomas Christopher Pinedo
Hilliard Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 64 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 02/04 4:11 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. This matter is dismissed without prejudice and all attorney's fees and costs shall be taxed against the Party incurring same. All Court dates and deadlines are hereby vacated, and all pending motions filed herein are denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 2/4/2025. (KMH)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
7 7 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 02/03 4:20 PM
JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Ernest Elgin Jackson, Ergon Trucking, Inc.,.(Luzarraga, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 10, 2025
6 6 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 01/10 4:36 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Ernest Elgin Jackson (Pinedo, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
5 5 7 pgs order Order Setting Hearing/Deadline Fri 12/27 1:30 PM
ORDER Setting Rule 16 Case Management Conference for 2/5/2025 at 10:30 AM in Room 221 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Parties are to conduct a Rule 26(f) Conference on or before 1/16/2025. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 12/27/2024. (KMH)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
4 4 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 12/23 4:53 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Ergon Trucking, Inc., identifying Corporate Parent Ergon, Inc. for Ergon Trucking, Inc.,. (Luzarraga, Jose)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/23 4:43 PM
Defendant Ergon Trucking, Inc.'s ANSWER to2 Complaint and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Ergon Trucking, Inc.,.(Luzarraga, Jose)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Mon 12/23 4:19 PM
ORIGINAL PETITION (Filed in State Court) against Ergon Trucking, Inc.,, filed by Ernest Elgin Jackson.(KMH)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 12/23 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ergon Trucking, Inc., Removing from 58th District Court of Jefferson County, Texas, case number 24DCCV2272. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10578354), filed by Ergon Trucking, Inc.,.(Luzarraga, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 12/23 4:17 PM
District Judge Michael J. Truncale added. (KMH)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 12/23 4:23 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ernest Elgin Jackson. (KMH)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 12/23 4:24 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (KMH)
Related: [-]