Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Joseph G Rosania Jr
Case #: 1:24-bk-17584
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Steel Fabricators, Inc.
617 N Timberline Rd
Fort Collins, CO 80524-1411
Represented By
Katharine S. Sender
Allen Vellone Wolf Helfrich & Factor P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Byron G. Rogers Federal Building 1961 Stout St. Ste. 12-200
Denver, CO 80294


Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
116 116 answer Objection Tue 05/06 4:02 PM
Objection Filed by Katharine S. Sender on behalf of Steel Fabricators, Inc. Related [+]. (Sender, Katharine)
Related: [-] 96 Motion to Dismiss Case
115 115 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Tue 05/06 3:52 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by Katharine S. Sender on behalf of Steel Fabricators, Inc.. (Sender, Katharine)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
114 114 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Fri 05/02 12:54 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 02/28/2025 Filed by Katharine S. Sender on behalf of Steel Fabricators, Inc.. (Sender, Katharine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
113 113 misc Certificate of Service Wed 04/30 5:06 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Katharine S. Sender on behalf of Steel Fabricators, Inc. Related [+]. (Sender, Katharine)
Related: [-] 111 Motion to Sell,112 9013-1.1 Notice
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
112 112 notice 9013-1.1 Notice Wed 04/30 4:32 PM
9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Katharine S. Sender on behalf of Steel Fabricators, Inc. Related [+].. 9013 Objections due by 5/14/2025 for111 ,. (Sender, Katharine)
Related: [-] 111 Motion to Sell
111 111 9 pgs motion Sell Wed 04/30 4:30 PM
Motion to Sell Other 2021 Accupress Advantage 740012 Press Brake Filed by Katharine S. Sender on behalf of Steel Fabricators, Inc.. (Sender, Katharine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order