New Jersey District Court
Judge:Zahid N Quraishi
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:24-cv-11431
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2024
Terminated:Mar 04, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 8:24 AM EST
Defendant
INTELLECTEU, INC.
Represented By
LINDA BIRUTA ALLE-MURPHY
Maschmeyer Karalis PC
contact info
Defendant
INTELLECTEU, NV
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-20
Notice Only
ANDRES MUNOZ
Notice Only
PHV SIDDARTHA RAO
Plaintiff
AXLETREE SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By
DANIEL SETH EICHHORN
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info

GPO Feb 24 2025
OPINION Filed. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 2/24/2025. (jal, )

Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
35 35 order Stipulation and Order Tue 03/04 10:20 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER that this matter shall be stayed while the parties appear for and attend arbitration. The Clerk's Office is Ordered to administratively terminate the case. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/4/2025. (kht)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 03/04 10:21 AM
***Civil Case Administratively Terminated. (kht)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
34 34 misc Stipulation Mon 03/03 10:39 AM
STIPULATION of Stay of Litigation by AXLETREE SOLUTIONS, INC..(EICHHORN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 letter
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
33 33 order Text Order Wed 02/26 10:48 AM
TEXT ORDER that in light of the Court's resolution of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, the previous Order 7 staying Defendants' deadline to respond to the Amended Complaint is hereby lifted. Defendants shall respond to the Amended Complaint in accordance with the federal and local civil rules as well as the judicial preferences of the undersigned. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 02/26/2025. (Gonzalez, P)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
32 32 1 pgs order Order Mon 02/24 11:01 AM
ORDER denying1 -5 motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 2/24/2025. (jal, )
Related: [-]
31 31 19 pgs order Opinion Mon 02/24 10:56 AM
OPINION Filed. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 2/24/2025. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
30 30 1 pgs minutes Miscellaneous Hearing Thu 02/13 2:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. [1-5]) Hearing held on 2/13/2025. Court Reserves Decision. (Court Reporter, Megan McKay-Soule (609-815-2319) (kas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
29 29 misc Letter Mon 02/10 7:14 PM
Letter from Daniel S. Eichhorn re 7 Text Order,,.(EICHHORN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Joint Witness and Evidence Schedule
Sunday, February 09, 2025
28 28 misc Letter Sun 02/09 3:53 PM
Letter from Linda Alle-Murphy. (ALLE-MURPHY, LINDA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
27 27 misc Certification Tue 02/04 9:13 AM
Certification on behalf of AXLETREE SOLUTIONS, INC..(EICHHORN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Brief,
Att: 9 Cert of Service,
Att: 10 cover letter
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Tue 02/04 9:58 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, SIDDARTHA RAO and ANDRES MUNOZ, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 02/03 4:31 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Siddartha Rao to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15992287.) (ALLE-MURPHY, LINDA)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 02/03 4:28 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andres Munoz to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15992226.) (ALLE-MURPHY, LINDA)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
24 24 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/31 4:02 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First against INTELLECTEU, NV, filed by AXLETREE SOLUTIONS, INC..(EICHHORN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Stipulation and Order Fri 01/31 3:47 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Axletree to file an amended complaint by 1/31/2025. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 1/31/2025. (amv)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 01/31 10:13 AM
Set Hearings: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/13/2025 at 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4W before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. (kas, ) Modified on 1/31/2025 (kas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order Thu 01/30 2:32 PM
LETTER ORDER Granting20 Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to file Reply Papers until 2/3/2025. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 1/30/2025. (amv)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Stipulation Thu 01/30 11:34 AM
STIPULATION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by AXLETREE SOLUTIONS, INC..(EICHHORN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
20 20 misc Letter Wed 01/29 1:36 PM
Letter from Daniel S. Eichhorn. (EICHHORN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
19 19 respoth Brief Tue 01/28 2:03 PM
BRIEF in Opposition to Motion for TRO(ALLE-MURPHY, LINDA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit Hapon Ex 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit Hapon Ex 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit Hapon Ex 3
Friday, January 24, 2025
18 18 order Text Order Fri 01/24 7:09 AM
TEXT ORDER that the Court has reviewed the parties' letters15 and16 . The request for a pre-motion conference is hereby denied. The parties are to instead meet and confer and file stipulations and proposed orders regarding (1) filing an Amended Complaint to add IntellectEU, NV as a defendant, and (2) Defendant's agreement to return and/or delete Plaintiff's proprietary confidential information. With respect to the parties' remaining dispute in their letters, the Court confirms that, as Plaintiff noted, a district court in the Third Circuit does have subject matter jurisdiction to grant preliminary injunctive relief in cases where the parties are bound by a prior agreement to arbitrate so long as "the traditional prerequisites for such relief are satisfied." Ortho Pharm. Corp. v. Amgen, 882 F.2d 806, 811-13 (3d Cir. 1989); Landmark Drug Co. v. Optum Rx, Civ. No. 24-24, 2024 WL 493274, at *3 (Feb. 8, 2024). Accordingly, the Court will address Plaintiff's application for preliminary injunctive relief prior to addressing the arbitrability of the parties' dispute. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 01/24/2025. (Gonzalez, P)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Thu 01/23 8:56 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The17 "BRIEF IN OPPOSITION" filed by LINDA BIRUTA ALLE-MURPHY on 1/22/2025 was submitted incorrectly as a "ANSWER". PLEASE RESUBMIT THE17 "BRIEF IN OPPOSITION" USING THE EVENT: Civil Events -> Motions and Related Filings -> Responses and Replies -> Brief. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/22 8:14 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Motion for TRO by INTELLECTEU, INC..(ALLE-MURPHY, LINDA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Borovyk Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration Hapon Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit Hapon Ex 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit Hapon Ex 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit Hapon Ex 3
16 16 misc Letter Wed 01/22 1:55 PM
Letter from Daniel S. Eichhorn. (EICHHORN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
15 15 misc Letter Tue 01/21 3:27 PM
Letter from Linda Alle-Murphy re14 Letter.(ALLE-MURPHY, LINDA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
qc QC - Electronic Signature Does Not Match E-filer Tue 01/21 8:59 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The LETTER submitted by LINDA ALLE-MURPHY on 1/19/2025 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 19, 2025
14 14 misc Letter Sun 01/19 10:57 AM
Letter from Andres Munoz. (ALLE-MURPHY, LINDA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/16 8:27 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice admission as to SIDDARTHA RAO. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/15/2025. (kht)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/15 3:35 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice admission as to ANDRES MUNOZ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/15/2025. (kht)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/10 11:21 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Siddartha Rao by INTELLECTEU, INC.. (ALLE-MURPHY, LINDA)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/10 11:13 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andres Munoz by INTELLECTEU, INC.. (ALLE-MURPHY, LINDA)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/10 10:27 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 1/10/2025. (amv)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/10 2:22 PM
Set Deadlines as to11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Siddartha Rao ,10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andres Munoz . Motion set for 2/3/2025 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
8 8 misc Proposed Order Thu 01/09 1:32 PM
Proposed Order by AXLETREE SOLUTIONS, INC..(EICHHORN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Letter
Thursday, January 02, 2025
7 7 order Text Order Thu 01/02 1:28 PM
TEXT ORDER that on 02/13/2025 at 10:30 a.m. an in-person Hearing will begin before the undersigned in Courtroom 4W as to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction1 . The parties are to meet and confer as to a briefing schedule and file a proposed scheduling order for that briefing by 01/10/2025. The parties are also to meet and confer on a proposed schedule for the Hearing, including the identity of any witnesses and evidence to be presented, and shall file their proposed schedule by 02/10/2025. Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is hereby STAYED pending the Court's resolution of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 01/02/2025. (Gonzalez, P)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 01/02 3:46 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Telephone Conference held on 1/2/2025. (kas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
6 6 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/31 9:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by LINDA BIRUTA ALLE-MURPHY on behalf of INTELLECTEU, INC. (ALLE-MURPHY, LINDA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 12/26 10:37 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to INTELLECTEU, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
4 4 1 pgs misc Letter Tue 12/24 10:22 AM
Letter from Daniel S. Eichhorn. (EICHHORN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
3 3 order Text Order Mon 12/23 4:48 PM
TEXT ORDER that on 01/02/2025 at 1:00 p.m., the Court will conduct a telephonic case management conference to address Plaintiff's application for preliminary injunctive relief1 . Counsel for Plaintiff shall coordinate the call to chambers at that time. Counsel for Plaintiff shall also immediately serve a copy of this Order on Defendant. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 12/23/2024. (Gonzalez, P)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 12/23 3:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Axletree Solutions, Inc. identifying axletree solutions, inc. as Corporate Parent.. (EICHHORN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
1 1 52 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/23 3:03 PM
COMPLAINT against INTELLECTEU, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15899110), filed by Axletree Solutions, Inc..(EICHHORN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief brief in support,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 1 pgs Statement Corp Disclosure Statement,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order proposed TRO Order,
Att: 5 Motion for TRO,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service Cert of Service,
Att: 7 letter
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Mon 12/23 4:03 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . DO NOT select a party if it is not in CAPITAL LETTERS or if it does not reflect the EXACT name as is found in the pleading, Create a new party. . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 12/23 4:05 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 12/26 10:33 AM
Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 12/26 3:28 PM
Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (dmr3)
Related: [-]