Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:24-bk-15641

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Wayne E Johnson
Case #: 6:24-ap-01126
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Curt M Jensen
3641 S. Allston Paseo, Unit 6
Ontario, CA 91761
Represented By
Curt M Jensen
contact info
Defendant
Luxe Custom Crafts LLC
12350 Doherty Street
Riverside, CA 92503
Represented By
Luxe Custom Crafts LLC
contact info
Defendant
DOES 1-25
Represented By
DOES 1-25
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher L Nelson
2168 Pendleton Road 122
Farmington, MO 63640
Represented By
Evan L Smith
Evan L Smith Attorney At Law
contact info
Trustee
Arturo Cisneros (TR)
3403 Tenth Street, Suite 714
Riverside, CA 92501
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Sunday, April 13, 2025
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 04/13 9:13 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/13/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, April 11, 2025
13 13 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 04/11 4:51 PM
Order Re: Status Conference and Scheduling Order - The Pretrial Conference is set on 2/24/2026 at 2:00 p.m., see order for more details. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/11/2025 Related [+]. (SH)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Christopher L Nelson
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Tue 04/08 5:13 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 02/24/2026 at 02:00 PM 3420 Twelfth StreetCourtroom 303Riverside, CA 92501 for1 , (SH)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Christopher L Nelson
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
12 12 misc Status report Tue 03/25 12:41 PM
Status report Joint Status Report [LBR 7016-1(a)(2)], with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Christopher L Nelson Related [+]. (Smith, Evan)
Related: [-] Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case)
Monday, February 03, 2025
11 11 notice Notice Mon 02/03 11:42 AM
Notice of Continued Status Conference, with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Christopher L Nelson. (Smith, Evan)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 01, 2025
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 02/01 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 02/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, January 31, 2025
9 9 court Case Reassigned - Admin Order Reassigning Judge Only (batch) Fri 01/31 11:05 AM
In accordance with the Administrative Order 25-01 dated 1/10/2025, this case is hereby reassigned from Judge Wayne E. Johnson to Judge Magdalena Reyes Bordeaux. (ME6)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
8 8 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 01/30 6:37 AM
Scheduling order. See order for details Re: (BNC-PDF) Signed on 1/30/2025 Related [+]. (YG)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Christopher L Nelson
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 01/30 6:39 AM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 04/08/2025 at 02:00 PM 3420 Twelfth Street Courtroom 303 Riverside, CA 92501 for1 , (YG)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Christopher L Nelson
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
7 7 misc Proof of service Wed 01/22 6:56 PM
Proof of service Filed by Defendant Curt M Jensen Related [+]. (Hendrix, J.)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/22 6:53 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Curt M Jensen. (Hendrix, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
5 5 misc Proof of service Wed 01/15 2:27 PM
Proof of service Proof of Personal Service of Summons, Adversary Complaint, and Notice of Status Conference on defendant Luxe Custom Crafts LLC Filed by Plaintiff Christopher L Nelson. (Smith, Evan)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proof of service Wed 01/15 2:23 PM
Proof of service Proof of Personal Service of Summons, Adversary Complaint, and Notice of Status Conference on defendant Curt M. Jensen Filed by Plaintiff Christopher L Nelson. (Smith, Evan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
3 3 court Hearing Set (Other) (AP Case) Mon 12/23 2:46 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 3/20/2025 at 10:30 AM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Wayne E. Johnson (YG)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Christopher L Nelson
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 12/23 2:45 PM
Summons Issued on DOES 1-25 Date Issued 12/23/2024, Answer Due 1/22/2025; Curt M Jensen Date Issued 12/23/2024, Answer Due 1/22/2025; Luxe Custom Crafts LLC Date Issued 12/23/2024, Answer Due 1/22/2025 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 3/20/2025 at 10:30 AM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Wayne E. Johnson (YG)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Christopher L Nelson
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/23 12:46 PM
Adversary case 6:24-ap-01126. Complaint by Christopher L Nelson against Curt M Jensen, Luxe Custom Crafts LLC, DOES 1-25. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Smith, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet