Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Federico A Moreno
Case #: 1:24-cv-25072
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2024
Terminated:May 20, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 6:28 AM EST
Defendant
Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By
Alicia M. Chiu
Greenberg Traurig, P.A.
contact info
Andrea E Nieto
Greenberg Traurig, P.A.
contact info
Mediator
Marlene Quintana
Plaintiff
Elisabeth Lincecum
Represented By
Noah E Storch
Richard Celler Legal, P.A.
contact info
Tanner Mishele Borges
Richard Celler Legal, P.A.
contact info
Jeremy James Jackson
Richard Celler Legal, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 85 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
26 26 order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Tue 05/20 5:07 PM
FINAL ORDER of Dismissal and Order Denying All Pending Motions as Moot. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/20/2025. See attached document for full details. (mvz)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Mon 05/05 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Elisabeth Lincecum (Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
24 24 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/21 9:39 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting23 Joint Motion to Reschedule Mediation. Mediation Hearing is now set for 7/28/2025 at 10:00 AM via Zoom before mediator Marlene Quintana. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/21/2025. (mvz)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
23 23 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/18 11:31 AM
Joint MOTION to Reschedule Mediation from May 7, 2025 to July 28, 2025 re16 ORDER Scheduling Mediation by Elisabeth Lincecum. (Borges, Tanner)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
22 22 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 04/11 10:14 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part21 Motion to Continue. Calendar Call set for 12/9/2025 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Jury Trial set for the two-week period commencing 12/15/2025 at 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/10/2025. See attached document for full details. (mvz)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
21 21 motion Continue Fri 04/04 5:39 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Order Deadlines re19 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1 filed by Amazon.com Services LLC by Amazon.com Services LLC. Responses due by 4/18/2025.(Nieto, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Continue Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thursday, February 06, 2025
20 20 misc Status Report Thu 02/06 4:57 PM
STATUS REPORT [REMOVAL] by Amazon.com Services LLC (Chiu, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
19 19 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Mon 02/03 11:25 AM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Amazon.com Services LLC (Chiu, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 01/27 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tanner Mishele Borges on behalf of Elisabeth Lincecum. Attorney Tanner Mishele Borges added to party Elisabeth Lincecum(pty:pla). (Borges, Tanner)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
17 17 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Fri 01/24 9:56 AM
Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Counsel for the removing party is directed to file a removal status report no later than February 7, 2025. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/23/2025. See attached document for full details. (mvz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Wed 01/22 9:33 AM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Mediator Marlene Quintana. Mediation Conference set for 5/7/2025 at 10:00 AM via Zoom. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/21/2025. See attached document for full details. (mvz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/21 12:23 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF PROPOSED ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION by Amazon.com Services LLC (Chiu, Alicia)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Striking Tue 01/21 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Striking 13 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney,12 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing filed by Marlene Quintana by Amazon.com Services LLC (Chiu, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
13 13 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Fri 01/17 3:11 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re12 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing. Proposed Order Docketed as Main Document ; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED WITHIN 3 DAYS - Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then resubmit the proposed order as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (ebz)
Related: [-]
12 12 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Fri 01/17 12:43 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Marlene Quintana as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 5/7/2025 at 10:00 a.m.. (Chiu, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
11 11 4 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Tue 01/14 12:18 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline is 8/4/2025. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/14/2025. See attached document for full details. (mvz)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/14 12:15 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial is set for the two-wee period commencing on 10/6/2025 at 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Calendar Call is set for 9/30/2025 at 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/14/2025. See attached document for full details. (mvz)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/10 2:44 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Amazon.com Services LLC. (Chiu, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 12/30 9:35 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting4 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Response/Answer is due on or before 1/13/2025. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/30/2024. (mvz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 12/26 12:20 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elisabeth Lincecum (Jackson, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions Thu 12/26 12:20 PM
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Elisabeth Lincecum (Jackson, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 12/26 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeremy James Jackson on behalf of Elisabeth Lincecum. Attorney Jeremy James Jackson added to party Elisabeth Lincecum(pty:pla). (Jackson, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 12/26 11:53 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Complaint by Amazon.com Services LLC.(Nieto, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint
3 3 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 12/26 10:57 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon.com Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc., Other Affiliate Amazon.com Sales, Inc. for Amazon.com Services LLC (Chiu, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 12/26 10:18 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ellen F. D'Angelo is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Mon 12/23 4:44 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Circuit Court of the Fifteenth Judicial Circuit, Miami-Dade County, Florida) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18075104, filed by Amazon.com Services LLC.(Chiu, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal