Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Jane J Boyle
Referred: David L Horan
Case #: 3:24-cv-03219
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2024
Terminated:May 02, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
8 8 order Judgment Fri 05/02 4:30 PM
JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the construed application for writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 5/2/2025) (ykp)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations Fri 05/02 4:25 PM
Order Accepting6 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge and Denying Certificate of Appealability re: Findings and Recommendations on Case re:3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 5/2/2025) (ykp)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 05/02 4:30 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7,8. Fri May 2 16:30:30 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
misc Order Receipt Thu 04/03 8:35 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Thu Apr 3 08:35:02 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
6 6 motion Findings and Recommendations Thu 04/03 8:33 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should dismiss this action without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/2/2025) (twd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order And Notice of Deficiency Thu 12/26 3:20 PM
Order and Notice of Deficiency: James Franklin Murphy, Jr must address the following deficiency: The submitted request to proceed in forma pauperis provides insufficient information to determine whether in forma pauperis status is appropriate. Certificate of inmate trust account required. Habeas corpus pleadings are not filed on the appropriate form. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 1/27/2025. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 12/26/2024) (ndt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2254,
Att: 2 IFP
misc Order Receipt Thu 12/26 3:20 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Thu Dec 26 15:20:48 CST 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 12/23 4:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Franklin Murphy, Jr. (knb)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Mon 12/23 4:26 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by James Franklin Murphy, Jr. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (knb)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Mon 12/23 4:25 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (knb)
Related: [-]
1 1 qcref Boyle Mon 12/23 4:24 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (knb)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 12/23 4:27 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Mon Dec 23 16:27:34 CST 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]