New York Southern District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Vyskocil
Case #: 1:24-cv-09880
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices)
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 02, 2025 3:56 AM EST
Defendant
Ann Marie Carlson
Defendant
Lisa Edgeworth
Defendant
Epiq eDiscovery Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
Stacey Sacks
Plaintiff
John Doe


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, January 31, 2025
16 16 misc Letter Mon 02/03 3:36 PM
LETTER from John Doe dated 1/27/2025 re: I am writing to request that the court waive the PACER search fees for my account (PACER Account Number: 8252467) due to financial hardship. On January 7, 2025, I received an Order Granting IFP Application, which allows me to proceed without paying the standard filing fees. I would like to request that my PACER Search Fees also be waived as part of this status. Document filed by John Doe..(nd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Wed 01/08 3:07 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 01/08 3:09 PM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vba)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order Granting IFP Application Tue 01/07 8:51 AM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/3/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
13 13 order Standing Order re Cases Filed By Pro Se Plaintiffs Mon 12/23 10:04 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may[LINK:consent to electronic service] to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for[LINK:permission to file documents electronically] . Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 03/18/2024) (sac)
Related: [-]
service Note Regarding Service on Self-Represented Party Mon 12/23 10:01 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see[LINK:Rule 9.2] of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information. (sac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
12 12 motion Permission for Electronic Case Filing Mon 12/23 10:01 AM
MOTION for Permission for John Doe to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by John Doe. (sac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit CM/ECF Introduction Course
11 11 motion Court to Request Counsel Mon 12/23 9:59 AM
APPLICATION for the Court to Request Pro Bono Counsel. Document filed by John Doe. (sac)
Related: [-]
10 10 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 12/23 9:57 AM
DECLARATION of John Doe in Support re:9 MOTION pursuant to Rule 5.2 of the FRCP for an order granting permission to redact personally identifiable information re:1 Complaint. Document filed by John Doe. (sac)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 12/23 9:56 AM
MOTION pursuant to Rule 5.2 of the FRCP for an order granting permission to redact personally identifiable information re:1 Complaint. Document filed by John Doe. (sac) Modified on 12/23/2024 (sac)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 12/23 9:49 AM
DECLARATION of John Doe in Support re:7 MOTION pursuant to Rule 10(a) of the FRCP for an order granting permission to proceed under a pseudonym re:1 Complaint. Document filed by John Doe. (sac)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 12/23 9:48 AM
MOTION pursuant to Rule 10(a) of the FRCP for an order granting permission to proceed under a pseudonym re:1 Complaint. Document filed by John Doe. (sac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint_Legal Name,
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint_Initials
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/23 9:29 AM
NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS re:1 Complaint. Document filed by John Doe. (sac)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 12/23 9:28 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ann Marie Carlson, Lisa Edgeworth, Epiq eDiscovery Solutions, Inc., Stacey Sacks, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by John Doe. (sac)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Mon 12/23 9:26 AM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: John Doe consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by John Doe. (sac)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 12/23 9:23 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 12/23 9:23 AM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by John Doe. (sac)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/23 9:22 AM
COMPLAINT against Ann Marie Carlson, Lisa Edgeworth, Epiq eDiscovery Solutions, Inc., Stacey Sacks. Document filed by John Doe. (sac)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 12/23 9:24 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sac)
Related: [-]