Hologram USA Inc et al. vs. Ventana 3D LLC et al.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Beverly Reid O'Conne |
Referred: | John E Mcdermott |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-09489 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:1338 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 10, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jan 07, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 08, 2015 7:30 AM PDT |
Defendant
ASHLEY CROWDER
|
|
Defendant
DOES 1 through 10
|
|
Defendant
BENJAMIN CONWAY
|
|
Defendant
Ventana 3D LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
VENTANA 3D, LLC (d/b/a VNTANA)
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Ashley Crowder
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Benjamin Conway
|
Represented By
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Philip Meldman
Southern California Mediation Group 6320 Canoga Avenue, Suite 1550
Woodland Hills, CA 91367 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hologram USA Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Uwe Maass
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
UWE MAASS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HOLOGRAM USA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, January 07, 2016 | ||
74 | 74
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Thu 01/07 10:04 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing). (jp) |
|
Att: 1 Order Dismissing Action | ||
73 | 73
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 01/07 10:00 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTIONWITH PREJUDICE72 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. The Court dismisses all of the claims, defenses, and counterclaims among the parties in Case No. 14-CV-09489-BRO-AGR with prejudice pursuant toFRCP 41(a) and (c); and Each Party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Wednesday, January 06, 2016 | ||
72 | 72
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 01/06 12:41 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) and (c filed by Plaintiff Hologram USA Inc, Uwe Maass. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE)(Baker, Ryan) |
|
Monday, January 04, 2016 | ||
71 | 71
respm
Amendment (Motion related)
Mon 01/04 6:02 PM
Amendment to APPLICATION to file document under seal64 filed by Defendants Benjamin Conway, Ashley Crowder, Ventana 3D LLC.(Sorich, John) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Scott Parker |