New Jersey District Court
Judge:Christine P O'Hearn
Referred: Elizabeth A Pascal
Case #: 1:24-cv-11451
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 24, 2024
Terminated:Feb 27, 2025
Case in other court:Camden County Superior Court, CAM-L-003719-24
Last checked: Friday Feb 07, 2025 10:09 AM EST
Cross Claimant
THOMAS J. GLOSSNER
Represented By
KEITH HARRIS
Braff, Harris & Sukoneck
contact info
CHRISTINE KLIMCZUK
Braff, Harris & Sukoneck
contact info
Cross Claimant
R&S MILLER TRUCKING, LLC
Represented By
KEITH HARRIS
Braff, Harris & Sukoneck
contact info
CHRISTINE KLIMCZUK
Braff, Harris & Sukoneck
contact info
Cross Defendant
JACK DOE NO. 1-10
Cross Defendant
JOHN DOE NO. 1-10
Defendant
THOMAS J. GLOSSNER
Represented By
KEITH HARRIS
Braff, Harris & Sukoneck
contact info
CHRISTINE KLIMCZUK
Braff, Harris & Sukoneck
contact info
Defendant
R&S MILLER TRUCKING, LLC
Represented By
KEITH HARRIS
Braff, Harris & Sukoneck
contact info
CHRISTINE KLIMCZUK
Braff, Harris & Sukoneck
contact info
Defendant
JACK DOE NO. 1-10
Defendant
JOHN DOE NO. 1-10
Notice Only
arbtre
Plaintiff
ABIGAIL SANTIAGO
Represented By
JOSEPH JOHN URBAN
Vincent J. Ciecka, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Tue 04/08 3:03 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by THOMAS J. GLOSSNER, R&S MILLER TRUCKING, LLC. (HARRIS, KEITH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Thu 02/27 10:44 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 4/28/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 2/26/2025. (kes, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
15 15 misc Letter Tue 02/25 4:26 PM
Letter from Keith Harris regarding settlement. (HARRIS, KEITH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
14 14 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/29 3:23 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/21/2025 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Counsel shall dial 1-856-210-8988, access code 756449926# to connect to the call. Amended Pleadings due by 5/2/2025. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 6/30/2025. The Clerk shall schedule arbitration for a date in September 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 1/29/2025. (sms2)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/29 8:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE KLIMCZUK on behalf of THOMAS J. GLOSSNER, R&S MILLER TRUCKING, LLC (KLIMCZUK, CHRISTINE)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 01/29 2:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/29/2025. (bda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
12 12 order Order Tue 01/21 4:11 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court RESCHEDULES the initial scheduling conference on January 22, 2025, at 10:30 a.m. to January 29, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. in Camden - Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 1/21/2025. (bda)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Letter Tue 01/21 2:19 PM
Letter from Keith Harris re4 Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden). (HARRIS, KEITH)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
10 10 misc Letter Mon 01/20 5:35 PM
Letter from Joseph J. Urban, Esq.. (URBAN, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
9 9 discov Joint Discovery Plan Fri 01/17 2:34 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by THOMAS J. GLOSSNER, R&S MILLER TRUCKING, LLC.(HARRIS, KEITH)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order Fri 01/17 11:48 AM
NOTICE: The Parties are reminded that the Joint Discovery Plan is due to Judge Pascal's Chambers for the Initial Scheduling Conference scheduled for January 22, 2025. The Joint Discovery Plan shall be filed on the docket.(bda)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
7 7 order Order Mon 01/13 1:14 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Amended Notice of Removal, (ECF No. 6), and finds it sufficient as to the amount in controversy. However, the Amended Notice of Removal fails to include additional factual allegations addressing the Court's concern regarding the membership of R&S Miller Trucking, LLC. (Order to Show Cause, ECF No. 5 at 2). Thus, the Order to Show Cause is discharged as to the amount in controversy. The Court will assess diversity of citizenship upon the filing of a Diversity Disclosure Statement by Defendants. So Ordered by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 1/13/25. (hem, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/06 4:05 PM
NOTICE by THOMAS J. GLOSSNER, R&S MILLER TRUCKING, LLC re5 Order to Show Cause, updated Notice of Removal (HARRIS, KEITH)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 01/03 2:29 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendants shall have fourteen (14) days to amend their Notice of Removal, to contain factual allegations properly demonstrating complete diversity of citizenship between plaintiff and all defendants, and an amount in controversy in excess of $75,000 as required by 28 U.S.C. § 1332(a). Signed by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 1/3/2025. (mag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
4 4 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Thu 12/26 5:23 PM
Order Initial Conference set for 1/22/2025 at 10:30 AM in Camden - Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 12/26/2024. (mag)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Thu 12/26 5:17 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action: Incorrect Cause of Action selected. Party Information: Party Names should be added to the docket exactly as they appear on the State Court Complaint . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (mag)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Arbitration Thu 12/26 5:18 PM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (mag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Tue 12/24 1:08 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by R&S MILLER TRUCKING, LLC. (HARRIS, KEITH)
Related: [-]
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Tue 12/24 1:06 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against JACK DOE 1-10 (fictitiously named defendants), JOHN DOE 1-10 (fictitiously named defendants) by THOMAS J. GLOSSNER, R&S MILLER TRUCKING, LLC.(HARRIS, KEITH)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 12/24 12:30 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THOMAS J. GLOSSNER, R&S MILLER TRUCKING, LLC from Camden County Superior Court of New Jersey, case number CAM-L-003719-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number BNJDC-15900455), filed by THOMAS J. GLOSSNER, R&S MILLER TRUCKING, LLC.(HARRIS, KEITH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 12/26 12:30 PM
Judge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. (dmw)
Related: [-]