New Jersey District Court
Judge:Esther Salas
Case #: 2:24-cv-11452
Nature of Suit540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Dec 24, 2024
Terminated:Mar 17, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago
Monday, March 17, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal Mon 03/17 2:18 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS that the above- captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 3/17/2025. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty) Fri 03/14 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by AHMET IHSAN KAHRAMAN (SEYITHANOGLU, AHMET)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Fri 03/14 3:02 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney ANGELA JUNEAU for MENDOZA JADDOU,ANGELA JUNEAU for SUSAN RAUFER,ANGELA JUNEAU for UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES added. (JUNEAU, ANGELA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
3 3 service Certificate of Service Thu 01/09 4:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AHMET IHSAN KAHRAMAN(SEYITHANOGLU, AHMET)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Tue 12/31 4:36 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information: Please be advised that when entering parties the parties must match the complaint. . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ld)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 12/27 9:02 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to MENDOZA JADDOU, SUSAN RAUFER, USCIS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 12/26 9:32 AM
Judge Esther Salas added. (ps)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 12/24 1:01 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15900521), filed by AHMET IHSAN KAHRAMAN.(SEYITHANOGLU, AHMET)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet