Hawaii District Court
Judge:Barry M Kurren
Case #: 1:14-cv-00552
Nature of Suit462 Immigration - Naturalization Application
Cause8:1446 Petition for Naturalization Hearing
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2014
Terminated:Jun 13, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Jun 07, 2015 1:20 AM HST
Petitioner
Mohamed Ismail El Gabry
Represented By
Gurmail G. Singh
Topa Financial Center
contact info
Respondent
David G. Gulick
Represented By
Christopher W. Dempsey
U.S. Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Respondent
Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Represented By
Christopher W. Dempsey
U.S. Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Respondent
Jeh Johnson
Represented By
Christopher W. Dempsey
U.S. Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Respondent
Katy K. Leung
Represented By
Christopher W. Dempsey
U.S. Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Respondent
Leon Rodriguez
Represented By
Christopher W. Dempsey
U.S. Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM HST
Monday, June 13, 2016
89 89 order Stipulation for Dismissal and Order Mon 06/13 1:03 PM
STIPULATION TO DISMISS by David G. Gulick, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Jeh Johnson, Katy K. Leung, Leon Rodriguez - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN on 6/13/2016. This action is dismissed with prejudice, as to all parties and claims, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41. (emt, )
Related: [-]
misc Court's Certificate of Service Mon 06/13 1:04 PM
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service -89 STIPULATION TO DISMISS has been served on June 13, 2016. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
Related: [-]