Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John L Badalamenti
Referred: Nicholas P Mizell
Case #: 2:24-cv-01170
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause09:0001 U.S. Arbitration Act
Case Filed:Dec 24, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 07, 2025 10:06 AM EST
Defendant
Melba Bearden
5379 Summit Road
Lyndhurst, OH 44122
Represented By
Matthew Carrieri
Lichten & Liss-Riordan
contact info
Michelle E. Nadeau
Kwall Barack Nadeau PLLC
contact info
Ryan D. Barack
Kwall Barack Nadeau PLLC
contact info
Harold L. Lichten
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, PC
contact info
Olena Savytska
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, PC
contact info
Defendant
Regina Washington
1211 Holgate Place
Valdosta, GA 31601
Represented By
Matthew Carrieri
Lichten & Liss-Riordan
contact info
Michelle E. Nadeau
Kwall Barack Nadeau PLLC
contact info
Ryan D. Barack
Kwall Barack Nadeau PLLC
contact info
Harold L. Lichten
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, PC
contact info
Olena Savytska
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
MedFirst Consulting Healthcare Staffing, LLC
co Agentis PLLC 45 Almeria Avenue
Coral Gables, FL 33134
Represented By
Paula A. Martinez
Agentis PLLC
contact info
Robert P. Charbonneau
Agentis PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
43 43 minutes Pretrial Conference - Preliminary Thu 05/08 2:19 PM
Minute Entry. ZOOM Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell: Rule 16(b) Conference held on 5/8/2025. (digital) (WRW)
Related: [-]
42 42 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Thu 05/08 9:24 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Deloitte, Inc. (Russell, Reed) Modified on 5/8/2025 to edit docket text (MSN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
41 41 notice Notice of Hearing - Reschedule Wed 05/07 8:30 AM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Rule 16(b) Conference hearing scheduled for 5/8/2025 at 11:00 AM is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Rule 16(b) Conference set for 5/8/2025 at 02:00 PM via Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
40 40 order Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically / Video Tue 05/06 5:07 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 39 the parties' joint motion to attend the Rule 16 conference remotely. Details for a Zoom video conference on May 8, 2025, at 2:00 p.m. will be separately noticed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 5/6/2025. (RCD)
Related: [-]
39 39 motion Appear Telephonically / Video Tue 05/06 3:04 PM
Joint MOTION for All Attorneys to appear telephonically by Melba Bearden, Regina Washington. (Barack, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
38 38 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 05/05 3:41 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation. (Russell, Reed)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
37 37 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Thu 05/01 3:52 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by MedFirst Consulting Healthcare Staffing, LLC. (Charbonneau, Robert)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Case Management Report Thu 05/01 3:49 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Charbonneau, Robert)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 05/01 1:50 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Melba Bearden, Regina Washington. Related case(s): Yes (Savytska, Olena)
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Thu 05/01 1:27 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Melba Bearden, Regina Washington. (Savytska, Olena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
33 33 respoth Response Wed 04/23 8:40 AM
SUR-REPLY in Opposition to30 Reply to Response to Motion to Intervene filed by Melba Bearden, Regina Washington. (ELA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
32 32 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Tue 04/22 12:38 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 31 defendants' motion for leave to file sur-reply. While Local Rule 3.01(d) clearly states, "a motion requesting leave to reply...must not include the proposed reply," the clerk of court is DIRECTED to docket Doc. 31-1 separately as defendants' sur-reply in opposition to plaintiffs' reply brief (Doc. 30 ) for the sake of efficiency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 4/22/2025. (RCD)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
31 31 motion Leave to File Document Mon 04/21 5:06 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Intervene by Deloitte and HHSC by Melba Bearden, Regina Washington.(Savytska, Olena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Sur-Reply
Monday, April 14, 2025
30 30 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/14 4:46 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re22 MOTION to Intervene Related [+] filed by Deloitte, Inc., Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation. (Russell, Reed)
Related: [-] ply in Support of Motion to Intervene
Monday, March 31, 2025
29 29 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Mon 03/31 9:05 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 28 Deloitte, Inc. and Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation's unopposed motion for leave to file a reply. By April 14, 2025, Deloitte and Hamilton must file a reply that does not exceed five pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 3/31/2025. (RCD)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
28 28 motion Leave to File Document Fri 03/28 3:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendants' Opposition to the Motion to Intervene Filed by Deloitte, Inc. and Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation by Deloitte, Inc., Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation. (Russell, Reed)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
27 27 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/19 3:56 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION to Intervene filed by Regina Washington. (Barack, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
26 26 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 03/10 9:39 AM
*** ENTERED IN ERROR. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JG) Modified on 3/10/2025 (JG)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Hearing - Reschedule Fri 03/07 11:34 AM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Rule 16(b) Conference scheduled for 3/20/2025 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Rule 16(b) Conference set for 5/8/2025 at 11:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. A case management report to be filed by 5/1/2025. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
24 24 order Order on Motion to Continue Thu 03/06 2:25 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting in part 23 plaintiff's unopposed motion to continue the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. The March 20, 2025, conference and case management report deadline will be rescheduled by separate notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 3/6/2025. (RCD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
23 23 motion Continue Wed 03/05 3:25 PM
MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Case Management Report Deadline by MedFirst Consulting Healthcare Staffing, LLC. (Charbonneau, Robert)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Intervene Wed 03/05 1:34 PM
MOTION to Intervene by Deloitte, Inc., Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation.(Russell, Reed)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Intervenors' Complaint to Compel Arbitration
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
21 21 respm Response to motion Wed 02/26 1:26 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and/or Stay Proceeding MOTION to Stay filed by MedFirst Consulting Healthcare Staffing, LLC. (Charbonneau, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 02/25 9:00 AM
NOTICE of hearing: Rule 16(b) Conference set for 3/20/2025 at 11:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. A case management report to be filed by 3/13/2025.(WRW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/11 1:32 PM
ORDER granting 16 , 17 , and 18 motions for special admission of attorneys Olena Savytska, Harold L. Lichten, Matthew Carrieri. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 2/11/2025. (RCD)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
misc Fees Paid - Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/10 12:02 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES PAID Related [+] by attorney Harold Lichten, Olena Savystka, Matthew Carrieri, appearing on behalf of Regina Washington, Melba Bearden. Related document:16 Unopposed MOTION for Olena Savytska to appear pro hac vice, 18 Unopposed MOTION for Matthew Carrieri to appear pro hac vice, 17 Unopposed MOTION for Harold L. Lichten to appear pro hac vice. (ABM)
Related: [-] ceipt Number 16889 for $450
Friday, February 07, 2025
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/07 4:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Matthew Carrieri to appear pro hac vice by Regina Washington, Melba Bearden. (Barack, Ryan)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/07 3:59 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Harold L. Lichten to appear pro hac vice by Regina Washington, Melba Bearden. (Barack, Ryan)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/07 3:58 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Olena Savytska to appear pro hac vice by Regina Washington, Melba Bearden. (Barack, Ryan)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 02/07 8:48 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Harold L. Lichten, Matthew Carrieri, Olena Savytska Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the lawyer seeking Special Admission or the motion may be filed in paper format; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
14 14 motion Dismiss Wed 02/05 3:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and/or Stay Proceeding by Regina Washington, Melba Bearden. (Barack, Ryan)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of appearance Wed 02/05 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle E. Nadeau on behalf of Regina Washington, Melba Bearden (Nadeau, Michelle)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of appearance Wed 02/05 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan D. Barack on behalf of Regina Washington, Melba Bearden (Barack, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
11 11 service Waiver of service executed Fri 01/10 5:01 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 01/08/2025 by MedFirst Consulting Healthcare Staffing, LLC as to All Defendants. (Charbonneau, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
10 10 service Summons issued Tue 01/07 2:37 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Melba Bearden, Regina Washington. (LSS)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
9 9 service Proposed summons Mon 01/06 5:32 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by MedFirst Consulting Healthcare Staffing, LLC. (Charbonneau, Robert)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Proposed summons Mon 01/06 5:31 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by MedFirst Consulting Healthcare Staffing, LLC. (Charbonneau, Robert)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing - Cancel Mon 01/06 3:00 PM
NOTICE canceling Rule 16(b) Conference scheduled for 2/27/2025 (WRW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 01/02 12:54 PM
NOTICE of hearing: IN PERSON - Rule 16(b)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
5 5 order Civil Action Order Fri 12/27 3:14 PM
CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/27/2024. (WRW)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 12/27 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Robert P. Charbonneau on behalf of MedFirst Consulting Healthcare Staffing, LLC. Lead Counsel: Robert P. Charbonneau. (Charbonneau, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 12/26 12:23 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Robert P. Charbonneau of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 12/26 9:56 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:24-cv-01170-JLB-NPM. (JOS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/24 1:09 PM
COMPLAINT And Petition to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to Federal Arbitration Act, To Enjoin Respondents' Prosecution of Civil Action Filed in Violation of Arbitration Provisions, and for Damages for Breach of Contract against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22853642) filed by MedFirst Consulting Healthcare Staffing, LLC.(Charbonneau, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit