Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:24-bk-15641

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Wayne E Johnson
Case #: 6:24-ap-01127
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Curt M Jensen
3641 S. Allston Paseo, Unit 6
Ontario, CA 91761
Represented By
Curt M Jensen
contact info
Plaintiff
RYAN JOHNSON
Represented By
Daniel J Ratajczak
Fabozzi And Miller Apc
contact info
Trustee
Larry D Simons (TR)
Law Offices of Larry D. Simons 3550 Vine Street, Suite 210
Riverside, CA 92507
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 05/02 9:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
11 11 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 04/30 3:25 PM
Order Re: Status Conference and Scheduling Order - The continued status conference is set on 2/24/26 at 2:00 p.m., see order for more details. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/30/2025 Related [+]. (SH)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff RYAN JOHNSON
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Tue 04/08 5:14 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 02/24/2026 at 02:00 PM 3420 Twelfth StreetCourtroom 303Riverside, CA 92501 for1 , (SH)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by RYAN JOHNSON
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
10 10 misc Status report Tue 03/25 4:19 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff RYAN JOHNSON Related [+]. (Ratajczak, Daniel)
Related: [-] Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case)
Thursday, February 06, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Hearing (AP Case) Thu 02/06 3:18 PM
Notice of Hearing of Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff RYAN JOHNSON. (Ratajczak, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 01, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 02/01 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, January 31, 2025
7 7 court Case Reassigned - Admin Order Reassigning Judge Only (batch) Fri 01/31 11:05 AM
In accordance with the Administrative Order 25-01 dated 1/10/2025, this case is hereby reassigned from Judge Wayne E. Johnson to Judge Magdalena Reyes Bordeaux. (ME6)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
6 6 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 01/30 6:32 AM
Scheduling order. See order for details Re: (BNC-PDF) Signed on 1/30/2025 Related [+]. (YG)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff RYAN JOHNSON
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 01/30 6:34 AM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 04/08/2025 at 02:00 PM 3420 Twelfth Street Courtroom 303 Riverside, CA 92501 for1 , (YG)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by RYAN JOHNSON
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
5 5 misc Proof of service Tue 01/21 9:21 AM
Proof of service Filed by Defendant Curt M Jensen Related [+]. (Hendrix, J.)
Related: [-] 4 Answer to Complaint
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/21 9:15 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Curt M Jensen. (Hendrix, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 12/30 11:21 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK:6:24-ap-01127-WJ] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A57849479. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Monday, December 23, 2024
3 3 court Hearing Set (Other) (AP Case) Mon 12/23 3:10 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 3/20/2025 at 10:30 AM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Wayne E. Johnson (YG)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff RYAN JOHNSON
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 12/23 3:09 PM
Summons Issued on Curt M Jensen Date Issued 12/23/2024, Answer Due 1/22/2025 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 3/20/2025 at 10:30 AM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Wayne E. Johnson (YG)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff RYAN JOHNSON
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/23 1:59 PM
Adversary case 6:24-ap-01127. Complaint by RYAN JOHNSON against Curt M Jensen. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Ratajczak, Daniel)
Related: [-]