Virginia Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Rebecca B Connelly
Case #: 6:24-bk-61406
Case Filed:Dec 24, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Jan 24, 2025

Debtor
MD RUSSELL CONSTRUCTION INC>
24009 Lighfoot Lane
Lignum, VA 22726
Represented By
Steven Shareff, Esq
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Hannah W. Hutman(436156)
Hoover Penrod 342 S. Main Street
Harrisonburg, VA 22801
U.S. Trustee
USTrustee
Office of the United States Trustee 210 First Street, Suite 505
Roanoke, VA 24011


Docket last updated: 12/25/2024 12:01 AM EST
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
1 1 39 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 Tue 12/24 1:23 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Steven Shareff Esq on behalf of MD RUSSELL CONSTRUCTION INC> (Shareff, Steven)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 12/24 1:25 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-61406 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A10994372. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
3 3 misc Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing Tue 12/24 1:26 PM
Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing Filed by Steven Shareff Esq on behalf of MD RUSSELL CONSTRUCTION INC>. (Shareff, Steven)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Meeting of Creditors 7 Business No Asset (AutoDocket) Tue 12/24 7:02 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/24/2025 at 10:00 AM via crmtg Zoom - Hutman: Meeting ID 495 849 0558, Passcode 1345831086, Phone 1 (540) 924-0301. (AutoAssign)
Related: [-]