New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Margo K Brodie
Referred: Marcia M Henry
Case #: 1:24-cv-08792
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 24, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 07, 2025 4:11 AM EST
Defendant
Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth Schwartz
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Ira Gregg Rosenstein
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sharon Lavy
Represented By
Lauren Israelovitch
National Jewish Advocacy Center
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
order Order(Other) Tue 04/15 12:48 PM
ORDER granting13 Proposed Briefing Schedule. The Court adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule for defendant's motion to dismiss. Defendant shall serve its motion on or before May 30, 2025; plaintiff shall serve its opposition on or before July 14, 2025; defendant shall serve its reply, if any, and file its fully briefed motion on or before August 13, 2025. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 4/15/2025. (MMB)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
13 13 misc Letter Mon 04/14 4:46 PM
Letter re: Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule Pursuant to the Court's April 2, 2025 Order by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Rosenstein, Ira)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Wed 04/02 12:16 PM
ORDER denying10 Defendant's request for a pre-motion conference. The parties are directed to confer and file a proposed briefing schedule for Defendant's motion to dismiss on or before April 14, 2025. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 4/2/2025. (EPM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
12 12 respoth Reply in Opposition Mon 03/31 9:50 PM
REPLY in Opposition Defendant's pre-motion conference letter filed by Sharon Lavy. (Israelovitch, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/24 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Friel Fleming on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Fleming, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Mon 03/24 12:08 PM
ORDER re:10 Letter MOTION for pre-motion conference. The Court directs Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's request for a pre-motion conference on or before March 31, 2025. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 3/24/2025. (EPM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 03/21 9:15 AM
Case reassigned to Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl. Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl no longer assigned as presider to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (DA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - Declined Thu 03/20 9:26 AM
NOTICE to Assign District Judge: The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to a district judge. (KC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
10 10 motion Pre Motion Conference Tue 03/18 4:51 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference concerning Delta's anticipated Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Rosenstein, Ira)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/06 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Schwartz on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Schwartz, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
order Order Reassigning Case Wed 02/05 9:46 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl (as related to 24-cv-7838)for all further proceedings. Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 2/5/2025. (KD)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Referred Wed 02/05 9:48 AM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. (KD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 01/28 5:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharon Lavy. Delta Air Lines, Inc. waiver sent on 1/17/2025, answer due 3/18/2025. (Israelovitch, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/21 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ira Gregg Rosenstein on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Rosenstein, Ira)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 01/16 9:43 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Sharon Lavy against Delta Air Lines, Inc., filed by Sharon Lavy. (Israelovitch, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 01/03 11:21 AM
Summons Issued as to Delta Air Lines, Inc. (JT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 12/26 12:07 PM
Proposed Summons. by Sharon Lavy (Israelovitch, Lauren)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 12/26 10:40 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Thu 12/26 10:38 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CV)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 12/26 10:37 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CV)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Thu 12/26 10:39 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The name on the summons does not match the name as it appears on the complaint., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 12/24 8:58 PM
COMPLAINT Sharon Lavy against Delta Air Lines, Inc. filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18612467 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Sharon Lavy. (Israelovitch, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons