Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-00553
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 25, 2024 1:17 AM CST
Defendant
Jairon Javier Ramos Gamez (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Houston
contact info
Houston Interpreter
contact info
Philip G Gallagher
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 12/25/2024 2:35 AM CST
Monday, December 23, 2024
Arrest (Rule 40) of Jairon Javier Ramos Gamez, filed. (glk4)
Related: [-]
***Set/Reset Hearings as to Jairon Javier Ramos Gamez: Initial Appearance - Rule 40 set for 12/23/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray (glk4)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Philip G Gallagher, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Jairon Javier Ramos Gamez, filed. (Gallagher, Philip)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Jairon Javier Ramos Gamez, filed. (jmm4)
Related: [-]
INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 5(c)(3) Minute Entry for proceedings held on 12/23/2024 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray as to Jairon Javier Ramos Gamez. Defendant first appearance on Pretrial Release Violation from the Texas Western District Court 1:21CR241 and advised of rights/charges. Defendant requests appointed counsel, Financial affidavit executed, Defendant appeared with counsel. Order appointing FPD to be entered, Defendant waives Identity and Waiver of 32.1 Hearing executed, Waiver of Identity executed on the record, Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing to be entered. Detention Hearing set for 12/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray Appearances: AUSA Lauren Valenti for USA; AFPD Amr Ahmed for Defendant.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter: No) (Pretrial Officer: Yes) Defendant remanded to custody, filed. (jmm4)
Related: [-]
Interpreter needed as to Jairon Javier Ramos Gamez. Language: SPANISH. Houston Interpreter for Jairon Javier Ramos Gamez added. (jmm4)
Related: [-]
1 1 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release from Western District of TX as to Jairon Javier Ramos Gamez, filed. (glk4)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant issued 12/18/2024; Returned Executed on 12/23/2024 as to Jairon Javier Ramos Gamez. Defendant was arrested in Houston, TX. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (glk4)
Related: [-]
3 3 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Jairon Javier Ramos Gamez, filed.
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Jairon Javier Ramos Gamez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (jmm4)
Related: [-]
5 5 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Jairon Javier Ramos Gamez Detention Hearing set for 12/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (jmm4)
Related: [-]