Vermont District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-00106
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2024
Terminated:Nov 07, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 25, 2024 2:16 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jonathan Ophardt, AUSA
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Nicole P. Cate, AUSA
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jason McGrath (1)
Terminated: 11/07/2024
Represented By
Steven L Barth, AFPD
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
FPD
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/25/2024 3:33 AM EST

Create an account to get the full docket for this case.