New Jersey District Court
Judge:Christine P O'Hearn
Referred: Sharon A King
Case #: 1:24-cv-11461
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Dec 26, 2024
Re-opened:Apr 08, 2025
Terminated:Apr 08, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of New Jersey, Gloucester County, GLO-L-001415-24
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 5:55 AM EST
Defendant
ALLIED UNIVERSAL
Represented By
SHANNON BOYNE
Martenson, Hasbrouck & Simon LLP
contact info
EZRA H. ALTER
Martenson Hasbrouck & Simon LLP
contact info
Defendant
COMMUNICATIONS TEST DESIGN, INC.
Represented By
KYLE L. WU
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
WILLIAM JAMES SIMMONS
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
ALICE BAYARD
Represented By
MATTHEW D. MILLER
Swartz Swidler, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Tue 04/08 10:19 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice, and without costs. Signed by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 4/8/25. (hem, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Wed 02/05 11:18 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 4/7/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 2/5/2025. (mag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
15 15 misc Letter Tue 02/04 8:52 PM
Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel Requesting 60-day Order. (MILLER, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
14 14 order Order Tue 01/21 2:44 PM
TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on February 11, 2025 at 10:00 am shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference 1-856-210-8988 conference ID: 838 070 792# Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall be filed on the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 1/21/25. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
13 13 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Fri 01/17 10:44 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 2/11/2025 at 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 1/17/2025. (aji, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
12 12 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 01/16 4:49 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by ALLIED UNIVERSAL. (ALTER, EZRA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 01/14 10:28 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALICE BAYARD. COMMUNICATIONS TEST DESIGN, INC. waiver sent on 1/6/2025, answer due 3/7/2025. (MILLER, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 01/03 9:27 AM
CLERK'S TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer - Document10 submitted by COMMUNICATIONS TEST DESIGN, INC. on 1/2/2025 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/16/2025. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
10 10 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Thu 01/02 5:30 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Communications Test Design, Inc... (WU, KYLE)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/02 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM JAMES SIMMONS on behalf of COMMUNICATIONS TEST DESIGN, INC. (SIMMONS, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 01/02 12:02 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by COMMUNICATIONS TEST DESIGN, INC.. (WU, KYLE)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/02 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by KYLE L. WU on behalf of COMMUNICATIONS TEST DESIGN, INC. (WU, KYLE)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Letter Thu 01/02 11:09 AM
Letter from defendant Communications Test Design, Inc. Consent to Removal. (WU, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 12/31 1:15 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The5 Application for Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer submitted by ALLIED UNIVERSAL on 12/30/2024 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/16/2025. (mag)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
5 5 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 12/30 4:40 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (BOYNE, SHANNON)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Updating Account Mon 12/30 9:36 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Appearance3 submitted by SHANNON BOYNE on 12/27/2024 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (mag)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
4 4 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 12/27 4:33 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by ALLIED UNIVERSAL. (ALTER, EZRA)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/27 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SHANNON BOYNE on behalf of ALLIED UNIVERSAL (BOYNE, SHANNON)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Fri 12/27 12:44 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action; Incorrect Cause of Action selected. Removal-Other Court Information; Format of State Court case number should appear as close to the original as possible. Be sure to include every digit, even the 0s. Do NOT include the dashes . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (sms2)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 12/27 12:44 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (sms2)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Fillable PDF Mon 12/30 7:49 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Diversity Disclosure Statement4 filed by EZRA H. ALTER, ESQ. on 12/27/2024 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (js)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 12/26 1:23 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALLIED UNIVERSAL. (ALTER, EZRA)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 12/26 1:09 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ALLIED UNIVERSAL from Superior Court of New Jersey, Gloucester County Law Division, case number GLO-L-001415-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15901650), filed by ALLIED UNIVERSAL.(ALTER, EZRA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 12/26 4:20 PM
Judge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dmw)
Related: [-]