Arman Keshishyan v. MarTech Stack LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Consuelo B Marshall |
Referred: | A Joel Richlin |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-11099 |
Nature of Suit | 485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Cause | 47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment |
Case Filed: | Dec 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 2:35 AM PST |
Defendant
MarTech Stack LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Arman Keshishyan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 09, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() IN CHAMBERS- ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: re: Notice (Other)12 . No later than June 3, 2025, the parties shall file either a stipulation re dismissal and order for dismissal, a notice of voluntary dismissal (to the extent permitted under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(i)), or a judgment. Failure to timely file a stipulation and order for dismissal, a notice of voluntary dismissal, or a judgment shall result in the dismissal of this action. See document for further information. (es) |
|
Thursday, April 03, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Resolution filed by Plaintiff Arman Keshishyan. (Lane, Gerald) |
|
Wednesday, March 05, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3), by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) the Stipulation is approved for all the reasons stated therein, and (2) Defendant's deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (Dkt. 1) is extended to April 9, 2025. (es) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to MarTech Stack LLC answer now due 4/9/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant MarTech Stack LLC.(Attorney John W. McGuinness added to party MarTech Stack LLC(pty:dft))(McGuinness, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, January 09, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Arman Keshishyan. upon MarTech Stack LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/8/2025, answer due 3/10/2025. Waiver of Service signed by A. Paul Heeringa. (Lane, Gerald) |
|
Monday, December 30, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (vv) |
|
Friday, December 27, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant MarTech Stack LLC. (et) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (et) |
|
Thursday, December 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Arman Keshishyan. (Lane, Gerald) |
|
3 | 3
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Arman Keshishyan. (Lane, Gerald) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Arman Keshishyan, (Lane, Gerald) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38816216 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Arman Keshishyan. (Attorney Gerald Donald Lane, Jr added to party Arman Keshishyan (pty:pla))(Lane, Gerald) |