California Central District Court
Judge:Consuelo B Marshall
Referred: A Joel Richlin
Case #: 2:24-cv-11099
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Dec 26, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 2:35 AM PST
Defendant
MarTech Stack LLC
Plaintiff
Arman Keshishyan
Represented By
Gerald Donald Lane, Jr.
Law Offices Of Jibrael Hindi, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 04/09 10:56 AM
IN CHAMBERS- ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: re: Notice (Other)12 . No later than June 3, 2025, the parties shall file either a stipulation re dismissal and order for dismissal, a notice of voluntary dismissal (to the extent permitted under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(i)), or a judgment. Failure to timely file a stipulation and order for dismissal, a notice of voluntary dismissal, or a judgment shall result in the dismissal of this action. See document for further information. (es)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/03 3:31 PM
Notice of Resolution filed by Plaintiff Arman Keshishyan. (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
11 11 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Wed 03/05 2:42 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3), by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) the Stipulation is approved for all the reasons stated therein, and (2) Defendant's deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (Dkt. 1) is extended to April 9, 2025. (es)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
10 10 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 02/25 2:41 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to MarTech Stack LLC answer now due 4/9/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant MarTech Stack LLC.(Attorney John W. McGuinness added to party MarTech Stack LLC(pty:dft))(McGuinness, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 09, 2025
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/09 6:41 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Arman Keshishyan. upon MarTech Stack LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/8/2025, answer due 3/10/2025. Waiver of Service signed by A. Paul Heeringa. (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 12/30 12:28 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (vv)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 12/27 8:47 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant MarTech Stack LLC. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 12/27 8:45 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 12/27 8:45 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 12/26 11:57 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Arman Keshishyan. (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 12/26 11:56 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Arman Keshishyan. (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 12/26 11:55 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Arman Keshishyan, (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 12/26 11:52 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38816216 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Arman Keshishyan. (Attorney Gerald Donald Lane, Jr added to party Arman Keshishyan (pty:pla))(Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]