Texas Western District Court
Judge:Xavier Rodriguez
Case #: 5:24-cv-01470
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Dec 26, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 5:01 AM CST
Defendant
Lloyd J. Austin, III
Secretary, Department of Defense 1400 Defense Pentagon
Washington, DC 20301
Defendant
Decypher Technologies, Ltd.
200 Concord Plaza Drive Suite 780
San Antonio, TX 78216
Represented By
Shafeeqa Watkins Giarratani
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, PC
contact info
Kathleen J. Sanz
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Briana Cobos
11510 Dakota Sky
San Antonio, TX 78249
Represented By
Victoria L. Watson
Alan Lescht & Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
33 33 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/29 7:52 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Briana Cobos, re18 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Pete Hegseth(Bilkis, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
32 32 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/08 5:52 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Briana Cobos, re18 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Pete Hegseth(Bilkis, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, March 27, 2025
order Order on Motion to Stay Case Thu 03/27 12:58 PM
Text Order GRANTING31 Motion to Stay Case entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The Parties Joint Motion to Stay is GRANTED. This matter is STAYED and all deadlines vacated pending resolution of the pending Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 18, 25.) The Parties are ORDERED to submit their Rule 26(f) report and proposed scheduling order no later than thirty days after the Courts resolution of the pending Motions to Dismiss. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (XR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 03/25 7:49 AM
Text Order GRANTING30 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for the plaintiff to file her opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss is hereby extended until 4/29/2025. The deadline for the defendant to reply to that opposition is hereby extended to May 13, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mmlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
31 31 motion Stay Case Mon 03/24 11:39 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss by Decypher Technologies, Ltd., Pete Hegseth.(Jeon, Huiju)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
30 30 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 03/24 9:52 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition by Briana Cobos. (Watson, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
29 29 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Thu 03/20 11:24 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Briana Cobos. Pete Hegseth served on 3/20/2025, answer due 5/19/2025. (Watson, Victoria)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/20 11:20 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Briana Cobos. Frank R. Kendall served on 3/20/2025, answer due 4/10/2025. (Watson, Victoria)
Related: [-]
service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Thu 03/20 11:31 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Briana Cobos. Frank R. Kendall served on 3/20/2025, answer due 5/19/2025.*** SERVICE DATE CORRECTED*** (vl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 03/19 2:10 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Briana Cobos. (Watson, Victoria)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 03/19 8:11 AM
Text Order MOOTING6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez in light of the filing of an amended complaint12 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mmlc)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 03/19 8:17 AM
Text Order MOOTING17 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez in light of the amended motion to dismiss18 that was filed in response to the amended complaint12 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mmlc)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 03/19 3:19 PM
Text Order GRANTING27 Agreed Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Plaintiff's deadline to file her response to Defendant DHA's Motion to Dismiss18 is extended to April 8, 2025, and Defendant DHA's deadline to file a reply in support of its motion is extended to May 9, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
26 26 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/18 2:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Briana Cobos. Decypher Technologies, Ltd. served on 3/17/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (Bilkis, Erica)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 03/18 12:12 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Decypher Technologies, Ltd..(Giarratani, Shafeeqa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
Monday, March 17, 2025
24 24 misc Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Mon 03/17 11:07 AM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Pete Hegseth. (Jeon, Huiju)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/14 8:29 AM
Text Order GRANTING23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mmlc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/13 8:22 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Victoria L. Watson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19907963) by on behalf of Briana Cobos. (Watson, Victoria)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/13 7:18 AM
Text Order GRANTING20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mmlc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
22 22 service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 03/12 10:47 AM
Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney (vl)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 03/12 9:28 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Briana Cobos. (Watson, Victoria)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/12 9:18 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Victoria L. Watson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19902095) by on behalf of Briana Cobos. (Watson, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 03/11 7:23 AM
Text Order GRANTING19 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The Clerk is directed to seal ECF No. 12. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mmlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
19 19 motion Leave to File Document Mon 03/10 5:37 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave by Briana Cobos.(Watson, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
18 18 motion Dismiss Mon 03/10 4:46 PM
Amended MOTION to Dismiss by Pete Hegseth.(Jeon, Huiju)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
17 17 motion Dismiss Mon 03/10 2:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Pete Hegseth.(Jeon, Huiju)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Thursday, March 06, 2025
16 16 notice Notice Fri 03/07 1:32 PM
NOTICE- Duplicate to Amended Complaint by Briana Cobos re12 Amended Complaint (vl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
15 15 9 pgs order Order Wed 03/05 1:01 PM
ORDER AND ADVISORY--It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed. R. Civ. P 26(f) to submit (1) a proposed scheduling order and (2) a Rule 26(f) Report in the formats shown in the attached documents for the Courts consideration by April 11, 2025. Failure to do so may result in the Courts entering its own scheduling order.. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (vl)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Wed 03/05 12:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Decypher Technologies, Ltd., Pete Hegseth, Frank R. Kendall. (vl)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 03/05 8:50 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Briana Cobos. (Watson, Victoria)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 03/05 11:23 AM
Text Order GRANTING 11 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The Clerk is DIRECTED to seal ECF Documents 1, 2, 3, 4, and 5. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
utility Notice of Correction Wed 03/05 11:33 AM
Notice of Correction: DOCUMENT EDITED TO REFLECT TITLE OF DOCUMENT re12 Complaint. (vl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
12 12 cmp Complaint Tue 03/04 7:51 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19867161), filed by Briana Cobos.(Watson, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 02/11 8:21 AM
Text Order GRANTING10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Decypher's Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for the Plaintiff to file the Response is hereby extended to March 4, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mmlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
11 11 motion Leave to File Document Mon 02/10 11:04 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Seal by Briana Cobos.(Watson, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 02/10 10:57 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Briana Cobos. (Watson, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/05 12:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Briana Cobos. Lloyd J. Austin, III served on 1/13/2025, answer due 2/3/2025.(Watson, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit mailing,
Att: 2 Exhibit mailing
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/05 12:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Briana Cobos. Decypher Technologies, Ltd. served on 1/7/2025, answer due 1/28/2025.(Watson, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit mailing
service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Wed 02/05 12:57 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Briana Cobos. Jamie Esparza served on 1/7/2025, answer due 3/10/2025. ****Service date Corrected*** (vl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Tue 01/28 1:37 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Decypher Technologies, Ltd.. (Giarratani, Shafeeqa)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 01/28 12:13 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Decypher Technologies, Ltd..(Giarratani, Shafeeqa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
Thursday, January 02, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued as to USA Thu 01/02 9:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Briana Cobos, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (vl)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 12/30 8:32 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Briana Cobos. (Watson, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 28, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Sat 12/28 12:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Lloyd J. Austin, III and Decypher Technologies, Ltd. (vl)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Sat 12/28 12:24 PM
Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (vl)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Sat 12/28 12:24 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (vl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 12/26 2:01 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Briana Cobos. (Watson, Victoria)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/26 1:55 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19614346), filed by Briana Cobos.(Watson, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet