New York Southern District Court
Judge:Katharine H Parker
Case #: 1:24-cv-09946
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Dec 26, 2024
Case in other court:Supreme Court New York County, 655636/2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 5:12 AM EST
Defendant
Argo Group
Represented By
Michael Jacobson
Ropers Majeski
contact info
Defendant
Argo Group US, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Jacobson
Ropers Majeski
contact info
Defendant
Argo Insurance Co.
Represented By
Michael Jacobson
Ropers Majeski
contact info
Defendant
Argonaut Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael Jacobson
Ropers Majeski
contact info
Plaintiff
Miguel Fittipaldi
Represented By
Danielle Nicole Johnson
Weg And Myers P.C.
contact info
Dennis T. D'Antonio
Weg And Myers, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Wed 05/07 11:01 AM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 6/5/2025 at 10:00 AM in Mediator's Office.(sni)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Tue 04/29 12:56 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 5/29/2025.(sge)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
19 19 order Mediation Referral Order Wed 04/23 4:37 PM
MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are notified that Local Civil Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. It is further ORDERED that, upon the conclusion of mediation, the parties shall file a letter on ECF informing the Court as to whether this case was resolved. SO ORDERED. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 5/7/2025. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 4/23/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
18 18 misc Letter Tue 04/22 2:54 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Danielle Johnson, Esq. dated April 22, 2025 re: Joint Letter per Judge's Request. Document filed by Miguel Fittipaldi..(Johnson, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/08 4:48 PM
POST-CONFERENCE ORDER: As discussed at the Case Management Conference on April 8, 2025, the parties shall file a joint letter by April 22, 2025, informing the Court whether the parties would like a referral to the mediation program. Further, the parties shall file a joint status letter by June 9, 2025, updating the Court on the status of discovery. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 4/8/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Case Management Conference Discovery Hearing Scheduling Conference Status Conference Settlement Conference Tue 04/08 11:44 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker - Courtroom 17D: Case Management Conference / Discovery / Scheduling / Status/ Settlement - held on 4/8/2025 :See Transcript for Details. A transcript of this proceeding is available by utilizing the attached order form. (ca)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/07 11:22 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: REMINDER of the Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2025 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katharine H. Parker re:15 Scheduling Order (ca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
15 15 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/11 12:16 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: A case management conference in this matter is scheduled for Tuesday, April 8, 2025 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2025 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/11/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
14 14 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 03/10 11:42 AM
CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Miguel Fittipaldi, Argo Group US, Inc., Argonaut Insurance Company, Argo Insurance Co., Argo Group. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. IT IS ORDERED: This case is referred to a United States magistrate judge to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/10/2025).(tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/04 1:29 PM
NOTICE of Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge. Document filed by Miguel Fittipaldi..(Johnson, Danielle)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Case Management Plan Tue 03/04 11:16 AM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this Order. Counsel for the parties believe the following alternative dispute resolution mechanisms may be helpful in resolving this case: Referral to the District's Mediation Program after the close of fact discovery. This case is to be tried to a jury. SO ORDERED. Expert Deposition due by 8/15/2025. Fact Discovery due by 7/2/2025. Expert Discovery due by 8/15/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 7/11/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/4/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/04 11:12 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:10 Letter, filed by Miguel Fittipaldi. ENDORSEMENT: The Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for Friday, March 7, 2025, at 10:00 A.M. is ADJOURNED sine die. The Court will enter the Case Management Plan under separate Order. The Case Management Plan indicates that all parties consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). The parties are reminded to submit to the Court a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/ AO-3.pdf, by not later than Friday, March 7, 2025. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/4/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
10 10 misc Letter Thu 02/27 12:23 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Danielle Johnson, Esq. dated February 27, 2025 re: Joint Letter and Case Management Plan per Judge's Request. Document filed by Miguel Fittipaldi..(Johnson, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Civil Case Management Plan
Wednesday, January 01, 2025
9 9 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 01/02 9:16 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/7/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/1/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/30 9:21 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Danielle Nicole Johnson on behalf of Miguel Fittipaldi..(Johnson, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
7 7 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/27 4:41 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Argo Group US, Inc., Argonaut Insurance Company, Argo Insurance Co., Argo Group..(Jacobson, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/27 1:29 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dennis T. D'Antonio on behalf of Miguel Fittipaldi..(D'Antonio, Dennis)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/27 10:40 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Michael Jacobson to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added; the jurisdiction of this action is based on diversity - the party/intervenor did not name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time - name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Please use the revised form found here NYSD form page (kw)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 12/27 11:41 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Jacobson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 12/27 11:43 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 12/27 11:44 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 12/27 11:45 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/26 3:34 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Jacobson on behalf of Argo Group US, Inc., Argonaut Insurance Company, Argo Insurance Co., Argo Group..(Jacobson, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/26 3:32 PM
ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Argo Group US, Inc., Argonaut Insurance Company, Argo Insurance Co., Argo Group..(Jacobson, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 12/26 3:28 PM
FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Argo Group US, Inc., Argonaut Insurance Company, Argo Insurance Co., Argo Group..(Jacobson, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 12/26 3:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Jacobson, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 12/26 3:21 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 655636/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30381613).Document filed by Argo Insurance Co., Argonaut Insurance Company, Argo Group US, Inc., Argo Group..(Jacobson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - NYCEF Docket