Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Brantley Starr
Case #: 3:24-cv-03239
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Dec 26, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 5:10 AM CST
Defendant
Eric L Pierre
Defendant
Pierre Tax and Wealth Management LLC
Plaintiff
The Expert Group
5830 Granite Parkway Suite 1000
Plano, TX 75024
Represented By
Brent Thomas Buyse
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Jacob Sparks
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Xenna Kayana Davis
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 77 minutes ago
Friday, March 07, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/07 1:13 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by Eric L Pierre, Pierre Tax and Wealth Management LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Lee H Staley added to party Eric L Pierre(pty:dft), Attorney Lee H Staley added to party Pierre Tax and Wealth Management LLC(pty:dft) (Staley, Lee)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
5 5 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 01/06 11:40 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Expert Group. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Sparks, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 12/26 5:38 PM
Summons Issued as to Eric L Pierre, Pierre Tax and Wealth Management LLC. (axm)
Related: [-]
3 3 qcref Starr Thu 12/26 5:37 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 12/26 4:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Expert Group. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Sparks, Jacob)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/26 2:31 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by The Expert Group. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-15150561) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sparks, Jacob)
Related: [-]