New York Southern District Court
Judge:Analisa Torres
Case #: 1:24-cv-09964
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Dec 26, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 25, 2025 6:01 AM EST
Defendant
Mark L. Mey
Defendant
Jeremy D. Thigpen
Defendant
Transocean Ltd.
Defendant
Thad Vayda
Movant
John Fogel
Represented By
Gregory Bradley Linkh
Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP
contact info
Movant
David J. Grey
Represented By
David Avi Rosenfeld
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp (li)
contact info
Movant
Patrick Kocher
Represented By
Gregory Bradley Linkh
Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP
contact info
Movant
John Mahoney
Represented By
Adam M. Apton
Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
contact info
Movant
Askel Matre
Represented By
Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Matay Gabor
Represented By
Rebecca Barbara Dawson
Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
36 36 misc Proposed Order Wed 05/14 2:09 PM
PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by David J. Grey. Related Document Number:35 ..(Rosenfeld, David)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 05/14 2:08 PM
MOTION for David A. Rosenfeld to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by David J. Grey..(Rosenfeld, David)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Wed 05/14 3:35 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. 36 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
34 34 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/08 1:53 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned parties, and subject to approval of the Court, as follows: a. Lead Plaintiff shall have until July 7, 2025, to submit any amended complaint in this action; b. Defendants shall move, answer, or otherwise respond to any such amended complaint on September 5, 2025; c. Lead Plaintiff's Opposition to any Motion(s) to Dismiss filed by Defendants shall be due on November 4, 2025; d. Defendants' Reply in Response to any such Opposition filed by Lead Plaintiff shall be due on December 4, 2025; and e. In the event that the Court denies, in whole or part, Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss Lead Plaintiff's forthcoming amended complaint, counsel for Lead Plaintiff and Defendants shall meet and confer within fourteen (14) days regarding scheduling for the remainder of the case and shall submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules of Practice II(B), for the Court's approval. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/8/2025) ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/7/2025., Motions due by 9/5/2025., Responses due by 11/4/2025, Replies due by 12/4/2025.) (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
33 33 misc Letter Wed 05/07 2:56 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Nicholas Porritt dated May 7, 2025 re: Proposed Case Management Order. Document filed by John Mahoney..(Porritt, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Case Management Order
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
32 32 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s) Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Order on Motion to Approve Wed 04/23 3:53 PM
ORDER terminating (23) Letter Motion for Extension of Time; granting (9) Motion to Consolidate Cases ; denying (9) Motion to Appoint ; denying (9) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting (13) Motion to Consolidate Cases ; granting (13) Motion to Appoint ; granting (13) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying (16) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying (16) Motion to Appoint ; granting (16) Motion to Consolidate Cases ; granting (19) Motion to Consolidate Cases ; denying (19) Motion to Appoint ; denying (19) Motion to Approve in case 1:24-cv-09964-AT. For the foregoing reasons, Mahoney's motion is GRANTED. These actions are CONSOLIDATED under the caption In re Transocean Ltd. Securities Litigation, No. 24 Civ. 9964. John Mahoney is APPOINTED as lead plaintiff, and Levi & Korsinsky is APPOINTED as lead counsel. The motions at ECF Nos. 9, 13, 16, and 19 are DENIED in all other respects. In accordance with the parties' endorsed stipulation at ECF No. 24, by May 7, 2025, the parties shall submit a joint letter and proposed case management plan. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 9, 13, 16, 19, and 23. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/23/2025) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-09964-AT, 1:25-cv-01112-AT (vfr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/04 12:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Ian Porritt on behalf of John Mahoney..(Porritt, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
30 30 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 03/17 10:28 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Patrick Kocher and John Fogel to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:24-cv-09964, 1:25-cv-01112 . . Document filed by John Fogel, Patrick Kocher..(Linkh, Gregory)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/17 10:00 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Patrick Kocher and John Fogel to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:24-cv-09964, 1:25-cv-01112 . . Document filed by John Mahoney..(Apton, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
28 28 11 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/10 9:10 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:25-cv-01112 . MOTION to Appoint Askel Matre to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Lead Counsel .,13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:24-cv-09964 and 1:25-cv-01112 . MOTION to Appoint John Mahoney to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .,9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:24-cv-09964; 1:25-cv-01112 . MOTION to Appoint David J. Grey to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Patrick Kocher, John Fogel..(Linkh, Gregory)
Related: [-]
27 27 13 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 03/10 8:39 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:24-cv-09964 and 1:25-cv-01112 . MOTION to Appoint John Mahoney to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by John Mahoney..(Apton, Adam)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/10 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion re:9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:24-cv-09964; 1:25-cv-01112 . MOTION to Appoint David J. Grey to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by David J. Grey..(Rosenfeld, David)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/10 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead Counsel re:19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:25-cv-01112 . MOTION to Appoint Askel Matre to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Lead Counsel .,13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:24-cv-09964 and 1:25-cv-01112 . MOTION to Appoint John Mahoney to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .,9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:24-cv-09964; 1:25-cv-01112 . MOTION to Appoint David J. Grey to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .,16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Patrick Kocher and John Fogel to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:24-cv-09964, 1:25-cv-01112 .. Document filed by Askel Matre..(Hood, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
24 24 order Stipulation and Order Fri 02/28 12:53 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED THAT: 1. Defendants shall, and hereby do, accept service of the Initial Complaint; 2. Defendants shall not be required to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the Initial Complaint until after a Lead Plaintiff has been appointed and Lead Plaintiff has filed an amended complaint (if any); and 3. In accordance with the Parties proposed schedule, the initial pretrial scheduling order shall be continued to a later date after the resolution of the anticipated motion to dismiss the consolidated amended complaint, 4. Within fourteen (14) days of appointment of Lead Plaintiff pursuant to 15 U.S.C.§78u-4, counsel for Lead Plaintiff and Defendants shall meet and confer regarding scheduling and shall submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules of Practice II(B) for the Court's approval with the Parties' proposed schedule for the filing of an amended complaint (if any) and the filing of any motion to dismiss and related briefing. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/28/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
23 23 motion Extension of Time Thu 02/27 4:56 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint and Motion to Dismiss Briefing addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Rebecca Dawson dated February 27, 2025. Document filed by Matay Gabor..(Dawson, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Stipulation and Order
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
misc Notice Regarding Deleted Document Wed 02/26 10:30 AM
***DELETED ENTRY. Deleted entry NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case.. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (tro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Tue 02/25 8:52 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. 12 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Tue 02/25 8:52 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. 20 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
22 22 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 02/24 11:35 PM
DECLARATION of J. Alexander Hood II in Support re:19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:25-cv-01112 . MOTION to Appoint Askel Matre to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Lead Counsel .. Document filed by Askel Matre..(Hood, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Damages Analysis,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Press Release,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Certification,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Movant Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Firm Resume
21 21 18 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 02/24 11:33 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:25-cv-01112 . MOTION to Appoint Askel Matre to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Lead Counsel . . Document filed by Askel Matre..(Hood, Joseph)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Proposed Order Mon 02/24 11:32 PM
PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Askel Matre. Related Document Number:19 ..(Hood, Joseph)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Consolidate Cases Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s) Approve Mon 02/24 11:31 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:25-cv-01112 ., MOTION to Appoint Askel Matre to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Approve Lead Counsel . Document filed by Askel Matre..(Hood, Joseph)
Related: [-]
18 18 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 02/24 10:40 PM
DECLARATION of Gregory B. Linkh in Support re:16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Patrick Kocher and John Fogel to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:24-cv-09964, 1:25-cv-01112 .. Document filed by Patrick Kocher, John Fogel..(Linkh, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Press Release,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Certification,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Joint Declaration of Movants,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - GPM Firm Resume
17 17 13 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 02/24 10:31 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Patrick Kocher and John Fogel to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:24-cv-09964, 1:25-cv-01112 . . Document filed by Patrick Kocher, John Fogel..(Linkh, Gregory)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Appoint Counsel Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s) Consolidate Cases Mon 02/24 10:28 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., MOTION to Appoint Patrick Kocher and John Fogel to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:24-cv-09964, 1:25-cv-01112 . Document filed by Patrick Kocher, John Fogel..(Linkh, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion
15 15 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 02/24 9:34 PM
DECLARATION of Adam M. Apton in Support re:13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:24-cv-09964 and 1:25-cv-01112 . MOTION to Appoint John Mahoney to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by John Mahoney..(Apton, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- PSLRA Certification,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Loss Chart,
Att: 3 Exhibit C- PSLRA Notice,
Att: 4 Exhibit D- Movant Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit E- Firm Resume
14 14 16 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 02/24 9:31 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:24-cv-09964 and 1:25-cv-01112 . MOTION to Appoint John Mahoney to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by John Mahoney..(Apton, Adam)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Consolidate Cases Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s) Appoint Counsel Mon 02/24 9:29 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:24-cv-09964 and 1:25-cv-01112 ., MOTION to Appoint John Mahoney to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by John Mahoney..(Apton, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion
12 12 misc Proposed Order Mon 02/24 8:48 PM
PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by David J. Grey. Related Document Number:9 ..(Rosenfeld, David)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 02/24 8:47 PM
DECLARATION of David A. Rosenfeld in Support re:9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:24-cv-09964; 1:25-cv-01112 . MOTION to Appoint David J. Grey to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by David J. Grey..(Rosenfeld, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Certification,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Estimate of Losses,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Mr. Grey's Declaration
10 10 9 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 02/24 8:46 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:24-cv-09964; 1:25-cv-01112 . MOTION to Appoint David J. Grey to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by David J. Grey..(Rosenfeld, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Consolidate Cases Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s) Appoint Counsel Mon 02/24 8:45 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:24-cv-09964; 1:25-cv-01112 ., MOTION to Appoint David J. Grey to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by David J. Grey..(Rosenfeld, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/24 8:42 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Avi Rosenfeld on behalf of David J. Grey..(Rosenfeld, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Mon 12/30 12:57 PM
ORDER To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/30/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order Mon 12/30 12:56 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER 1. Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by March 3, 2025, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. 2. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF TIDS ORDER AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO ALL PARTIES. 3. This case has been designated for electronic case filing. By the deadline for submissions, counsel for all patties are required to register as ECF filers and file a notice of appearance in accordance with the Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions (https://nysd.uscomts.gov/electronic-case-filing). 4. The patties are directed to submit a joint letter addressing the following in separate paragraphs: (1) a brief description of the case, including the factual and legal bases for the claim(s) and defense(s), (2) any contemplated motions, and (3) the prospect for settlement.5. The patties are directed to submit with their joint letter a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. The patties are directed to consult the Court's Individual Practices and model Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which are available at https://nysd.uscomts.gov/hon-analisa-torres. Both the joint letter and the proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order shall be filed electronically on ECF, with a courtesy copy of each, clearly marked as such, emailed to chambers (Torres nysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) in accordance with the Court's Individual Practices (See Rule LB.) 6. Requests for adjournment of the deadline for the above submissions will be considered only if made in writing and in accordance with the Court's Individual Practices (See Rule LC).7. The patties are advised that the Court requires pre-motion letters before a motion is filed (See Rules III.A-C). 8. If this case has been settled or otherwise terminated, counsel are required to file a stipulation of discontinuance, voluntary dismissal, or other proof of termination electronically on ECF, with a courtesy copy emailed to chambers in accordance with the Courts Individual Practices. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/30/2024) (ar)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order Mon 12/30 12:50 PM
ORDER To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendants shall, by March 3, 2025, file a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://nysd.uscomis.gov/node/754 and attached to this order, on the docket. If the Court approves that fo1m, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any pa1ty does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by March 3, 2025, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/30/2024) (ar)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 12/27 1:17 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark L. Mey, Jeremy D. Thigpen, Transocean Ltd., Thad Vayda..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 12/27 11:32 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 12/27 11:33 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 12/27 11:33 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 12/27 11:33 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Rebecca Barbara Dawson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Mtay Gbor. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 12/27 11:33 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Rebecca Barbara Dawson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code XX Out of State;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 12/26 6:03 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Transocean Ltd., Jeremy D. Thigpen, Mark L. Mey, and Thad Vayda, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Mtay Gbor..(Dawson, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 12/26 5:59 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dawson, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/26 5:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Mark L. Mey, Jeremy D. Thigpen, Transocean Ltd., Thad Vayda. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30382587)Document filed by Mtay Gbor..(Dawson, Rebecca)
Related: [-]