California Northern District Court
Judge:Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 5:24-cv-09451
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 26, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 2:46 AM PST
Defendant
Capital Asset Exchange and Trading, LLC
Represented By
William J. Frimel
Seubert Frimel & Warner LLP
contact info
Christopher Ramsey Edgar
Seubert French Frimel & Warner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GMC Semitech Co., Ltd.
Represented By
Scott Robert Raber
Rimon, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Suzhou Cycas Microelectronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By
Scott Robert Raber
Rimon, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
24 24 10 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 04/29 4:42 PM
ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Re: Dkt. Nos. 9 , 14 , 15]. Plaintiffs must file an amended complaint or a statement indicating they do not intend to amend the complaint by 5/13/2025. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 04/14 4:05 PM
ORDER GRANTING 22 Stipulation to Continue. Case Management Conference set for 6/11/225, is continued to 6/25/2025, at 10:00 AM by Zoom, with CMC statement due 6/18/2025. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
22 22 2 pgs motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 04/11 1:11 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER continuing case management conference filed by Capital Asset Exchange and Trading, LLC.(Edgar, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order Continuing Case Management Conference
Monday, March 17, 2025
21 21 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 03/17 2:25 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE:9 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Hearing set for 3/26/2025, at 11:00 AM is vacated. The motion will be decided on the papers. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2025, is continued to 6/11/2025, at 10:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 6/4/2025. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/nc] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
20 20 1 pgs adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 03/05 6:58 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff, Suzhou Cycas Microelectronics Co. Ltd. (Raber, Scott)
Related: [-]
19 19 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 03/05 6:54 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff, GMC Semitech Co. Ltd. (Raber, Scott)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 03/05 3:03 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Frimel, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
17 17 5 pgs respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Tue 03/04 12:25 PM
Response to Order to Show Cause16 Order to Show Cause,1 Complaint, by GMC Semitech Co., Ltd., Suzhou Cycas Microelectronics Co., Ltd..(Raber, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 02/18 7:01 PM
ORDER FOR PLAINTIFFS TO SHOW CAUSE Establishing Diversity Jurisdiction. Plaintiffs to show cause in writing by 3/4/2025. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 2/18/2025. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
15 15 20 pgs respm Reply to Opposition/Response Fri 02/14 2:34 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byCapital Asset Exchange and Trading, LLC. (Edgar, Christopher)
Related: [-] 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint
Friday, February 07, 2025
14 14 19 pgs respm Opposition/Response to Motion Fri 02/07 6:58 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byGMC Semitech Co., Ltd., Suzhou Cycas Microelectronics Co., Ltd..(Raber, Scott)
Related: [-] 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
13 13 2 pgs notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 01/29 7:55 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Capital Asset Exchange and Trading, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CAE Integrated LLC, Other Affiliate David Ruiz, Other Affiliate WBJ Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Ryan F. Jacob, Other Affiliate Jeffrey Robbins, Other Affiliate John Sgro, Other Affiliate Austin Gill for Capital Asset Exchange and Trading, LLC. (Frimel, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 01/27 2:24 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . REMINDER: Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials NC immediately after the case number. Counsel need not re-file the document. Re: 10 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Capital Asset Exchange and Trading, LLC (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 01/27 2:29 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . NAMES NOT ENTERED [err102] All names of interested entities or person MUST be entered at the prompt. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: 11 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Capital Asset Exchange and Trading, LLC (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 01/24 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by William J. Frimel on behalf of Capital Asset Exchange and Trading, LLC (Frimel, William)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 01/24 9:54 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Capital Asset Exchange and Trading, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CAE Integrated LLC for Capital Asset Exchange and Trading, LLC. (Edgar, Christopher)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 01/24 9:52 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Capital Asset Exchange and Trading, LLC.. (Edgar, Christopher)
Related: [-]
9 9 15 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 01/24 9:51 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Capital Asset Exchange and Trading, LLC. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 3/26/2025 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. Responses due by 2/7/2025. Replies due by 2/14/2025.(Edgar, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss
Friday, January 10, 2025
8 8 1 pgs misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 01/10 5:25 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by GMC Semitech Co., Ltd., Suzhou Cycas Microelectronics Co., Ltd... (Raber, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
7 7 2 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/08 3:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GMC Semitech Co., Ltd., Suzhou Cycas Microelectronics Co., Ltd.. Capital Asset Exchange and Trading, LLC served on 1/3/2025, answer due 1/24/2025. (Raber, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
6 6 3 pgs order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 12/27 12:26 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2025 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 12/27 12:24 PM
Summons Issued as to Capital Asset Exchange and Trading, LLC. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 12/27 9:25 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/10/2025. (kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
3 3 2 pgs notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 12/26 4:38 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by GMC Semitech Co., Ltd., Suzhou Cycas Microelectronics Co., Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent GMC Semitech Co., Ltd. for Suzhou Cycas Microelectronics Co., Ltd.. (Raber, Scott)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs misc Proposed Summons Thu 12/26 4:28 PM
Proposed Summons. (Raber, Scott)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/26 4:22 PM
COMPLAINT against Capital Asset Exchange and Trading, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20178240.). Filed by GMC Semitech Co., Ltd., Suzhou Cycas Microelectronics Co., Ltd..(Raber, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet