New Jersey District Court
Judge:Claire C Cecchi
Referred: Jessica S Allen
Case #: 2:24-cv-11467
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Dec 26, 2024
Terminated:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 5:57 AM EST
Defendant
CHANGE HEALTHCARE INC.
Defendant
OPTUM INC.
Plaintiff
COLUMBUS LTACH, LLC
Represented By
ROBERT ANTHONY AGRESTA
The Agresta Firm, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, January 23, 2025
6 6 mdl MDL Transfer Order (out) Thu 01/23 8:41 AM
Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of Minnesota. (krg, )
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Court Transfer Thu 01/23 8:42 AM
Case extracted via ECF to District of Minnesota. (krg, )
Related: [-]
utility Remark (public) Thu 01/23 9:59 AM
Remark: Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in U.S. District of Minnesota as case 0:25-cv-00253, filed 01/23/2025. (krg, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 12/31 2:09 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHANGE HEALTHCARE INC., OPTUM INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
4 4 misc Letter Fri 12/27 1:10 PM
Letter from Robert Agresta, Esq. re: MDL-3108 Related [+].(AGRESTA, ROBERT)
Related: [-] lated Action
Att: 1 Exhibit Filed Notice of Related Action
3 3 misc Exhibit (to Document) Fri 12/27 11:52 AM
Exhibit to1 Complaint JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet by COLUMBUS LTACH, LLC D/B/A SILVER LAKE HOSPITAL. (AGRESTA, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Fri 12/27 6:59 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ps)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 12/27 11:58 AM
Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen added. (ps)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 12/26 7:40 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by COLUMBUS LTACH, LLC D/B/A SILVER LAKE HOSPITAL identifying Columbus LTACH, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (AGRESTA, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/26 7:34 PM
COMPLAINT against CHANGE HEALTHCARE INC., Optum Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15902673) with JURY DEMAND, filed by COLUMBUS LTACH, LLC D/B/A SILVER LAKE HOSPITAL.(AGRESTA, ROBERT)
Related: [-]