California Northern District Court
Judge:Lisa J Cisneros
Case #: 3:24-cv-09308
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2024
Terminated:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 4:26 AM PST
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Defendant
USCIS
Plaintiff
Prahlad Purohit
35423 Ardo Ct
Fremont, CA 94536


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 01/15 9:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Prahlad Purohit(Purohit, Prahlad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Friday, December 27, 2024
4 4 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 12/27 9:13 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Prahlad Purohit.. (Purohit, Prahlad)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Thu 12/26 9:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Ur M. Jaddou, USCIS(hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Thu 12/26 9:49 AM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order (hdj, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/26 9:47 AM
COMPLAINT against Ur M. Jaddou, USCIS (Filing fee $ 405-#311171343). Filed by Prahlad Purohit. Consent/Declination due by 1/6/2025.(hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 receipt