California Northern District Court
Judge:Jacqueline Scott Corley
Case #: 3:24-cv-09388
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 4:31 AM PST
Defendant
Crimson Wine Group, Ltd.
Plaintiff
Joanne Kaplan
Represented By
Catherine Elizabeth Ybarra
Siri & Glimstad LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Wed 03/12 2:58 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2025 is continued to 7/2/2025 at 2:00 p.m. by a Zoom webinar. Joint Case Management Statement is due by 6/25/2025. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 7/1/2025. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 3 pgs order Order Wed 03/12 2:54 PM
ORDER granting 12 Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Private Mediation. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/12/2025. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Private ADR Wed 03/12 2:55 PM
CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
12 12 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation Tue 03/11 3:12 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Joanne Kaplan STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO STAY ALL CASE DEADLINES PENDING MEDIATION filed by Joanne Kaplan. (Ybarra, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
11 11 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Mon 03/03 3:14 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Ybarra, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
10 10 order Order on Stipulation Tue 02/25 6:44 PM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 9 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint to April 2, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 02/25 3:51 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Crimson Wine Group, Ltd.. (Hagen, Fredrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Fri 01/10 9:20 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/20/2025. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 3/27/2025 at 1:30 p.m. by a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 3/26/2025. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/10 9:07 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 1/10/2025.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Thursday, January 09, 2025
6 6 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Thu 01/09 3:08 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bxl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 01/09 11:41 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joanne Kaplan.. (Ybarra, Catherine)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/09 10:35 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joanne Kaplan. Service waived by Crimson Wine Group, Ltd. waiver sent on 1/2/2025, answer due 3/3/2025. (Ybarra, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 12/27 12:40 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2025 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 12/26 10:25 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/9/2025. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
1 1 52 pgs COMPLAINT against Crimson Wine Group, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20174096.). Filed by Joanne Kaplan.(Ybarra, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons