Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Henry E Hudson
Case #: 3:24-cv-00908
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1345 Foreclosure
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2024
Last checked: Monday Feb 10, 2025 4:37 AM EST
Defendant
Aqua Finance, Inc.
1 Corporate Drive Suite 300
Wausau, WI 54401
Defendant
Cavalry SPV I, LLC
1 American Lane Suite 220
Greenwich, CT 06831
Defendant
Discover Bank
2500 Lake Cook Road
Riverwoods, IL 60015
Defendant
Juanita L Epps
5915 Sentry Hill Court
North Dinwiddie, VA 23803
Defendant
Donald E Lee, Jr.
Defendant
TD Bank USA, N.A.
1701 Marlton Pike East
Cherry Hill, NJ 08003
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
101 North Phillips Avenue
Sioux Falls, SD 57104
Defendant
Secretary of Department of Housing and Urban Development
Plaintiff
Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By
Robert Anthony Oliveri, Jr.
Brock & Scott. PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC
Represented By
Robert Anthony Oliveri, Jr.
Brock & Scott. PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
27 27 misc Suggestion of Bankruptcy Wed 04/30 11:35 AM
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Juanita L. Epps by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC. (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
26 26 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/30 10:54 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Secretary of Department of Housing and Urban Development.(Lucier, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
25 25 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/21 3:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC Cavalry SPV I, LLC served on 3/5/2025, answer due 3/26/2025 (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/21 3:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC TD Bank USA, N.A. served on 3/5/2025, answer due 3/26/2025 (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/21 3:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 3/5/2025, answer due 3/26/2025 (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/21 3:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC Discover Bank served on 3/5/2025, answer due 3/26/2025 (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/21 3:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC Aqua Finance, Inc. served on 3/5/2025, answer due 3/26/2025 (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/21 3:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC Donald E Lee, Jr. served on 3/3/2025, answer due 3/24/2025 (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
19 19 3 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/21 3:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC Juanita L Epps served on 3/14/2025, answer due 4/4/2025 (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Fri 03/21 3:32 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. Secretary of Department of Housing and Urban Development served on 3/6/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/07 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Tyler Lucier on behalf of Secretary of Department of Housing and Urban Development (Lucier, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
16 16 20 pgs service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 02/26 12:34 PM
Summons Issued as to Aqua Finance, Inc.; Cavalry SPV I, LLC; Discover Bank; Juanita L Epps; Donald E Lee, Jr.; Secretary of Department of Housing and Urban Development; TD Bank USA, N.A.; Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplex copies of the Electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention. Electronically file the summons return using the filing events Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. Please ensure that the original summons page signed by the clerk is the first document to appear when filing the return of service. (ewat, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
15 15 misc Proposed Summons Tue 02/25 9:03 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint,, for Cavalry SPV I, LLC by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Proposed Summons Tue 02/25 9:02 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint,, for TD Bank USA, N.A. by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Proposed Summons Tue 02/25 9:01 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint,, for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Proposed Summons Tue 02/25 9:00 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint,, for Discover Bank by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs misc Proposed Summons Tue 02/25 8:59 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint,, for Aqua Finance, Inc. by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Proposed Summons Tue 02/25 8:57 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint,, for Donald E. Lee, Jr., Trustee by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Proposed Summons Tue 02/25 8:51 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint,, for Juanita L. Epps by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Proposed Summons Tue 02/25 8:50 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint,, for Secretary of HUD by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Proposed Summons Tue 02/25 8:49 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint,, for Secretary of HUD c/o U.S. Attorney General by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Proposed Summons Tue 02/25 8:47 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint,, for Secretary of HUD c/o U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
5 5 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Thu 01/23 8:53 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC. (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Thu 01/23 8:53 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Thu 01/23 7:51 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC. (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Thu 01/23 7:50 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/27 11:22 AM
Complaint for a Judicial Sale ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9920648.), filed by Trustee Services of Virginia, LLC, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC.(Oliveri, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 2012 Deed,
Att: 2 17 pgs Exhibit 2018 Deed of Trust,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2023 Assignment,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2024 Substitution of Trustee,
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit 2023 UCC Lien,
Att: 6 Exhibit 2023 Discover Bank Judgment,
Att: 7 Exhibit 2023 Wells Fargo Bank Judgment,
Att: 8 Exhibit 2024 Virginia Deed of Trust,
Att: 9 9 pgs Exhibit 2024 Loan Modification Agreement,
Att: 10 Exhibit 2024 TD Bank USA Judgment,
Att: 11 2 pgs Exhibit 2024 Cavalry SPV I Judgment,
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Fri 12/27 1:04 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (ewat, )
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Fri 12/27 1:07 PM
Notice of Correction: Counsel is reminded to file Proposed Summonses as soon as possible. (ewat, )
Related: [-]