California Eastern District Court
Judge:Dale A Drozd
Case #: 2:24-cv-03736
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 26, 2024
Case in other court:Sacramento County Superior Court, 24CV023863
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 2:02 AM PST
Defendant
Examworks Compliance Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Leo P. Norton
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Sheereen Javadizadeh
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Examworks Group, LLC
Represented By
Leo P. Norton
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Sheereen Javadizadeh
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Examworks, LLC
Represented By
Leo P. Norton
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Sheereen Javadizadeh
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
IME Resources, LLC
Represented By
Leo P. Norton
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Patricia Matias
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Sheereen Javadizadeh
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Arden Whips
Represented By
Norman Blumenthal
Blumenthal Nordrehaug & Bhowmik, LLP
contact info
Trevor Girard Moran
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Sergio Julian Puche
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik & De Blouw
contact info
Jeffrey S. Herman
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Aparajit Bhowmik
Blumenthal, Nordrehaug & Bhowmik
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, February 24, 2025
18 18 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion to Remand Mon 02/24 2:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/24/2025: Pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the pending15 Motion to Remand is SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 3/17/2025 is VACATED, to be reset at a later date if the court determines that oral argument is needed. (Deputy Clerk PAB)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
17 17 misc Reply Fri 02/14 10:55 AM
REPLY by Arden Whips re15 Motion to Remand,. (Herman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
16 16 respm Opposition to Motion Fri 02/07 4:27 PM
OPPOSITION by Examworks Compliance Solutions, LLC, Examworks Group, LLC, Examworks, LLC, IME Resources, LLC to15 Motion to Remand,. (Norton, Leo)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
15 15 motion Remand Fri 01/24 3:10 PM
MOTION to REMAND Case to State Court by Arden Whips. Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.(Moran, Trevor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case To State Court,
Att: 2 Declaration Declation of Trevor G. Moran in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remnad Case to State Court,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Action to State Court
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
14 14 service Certificate / Proof of Service Wed 01/15 1:57 PM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Examworks Compliance Solutions, LLC, Examworks Group, LLC, Examworks, LLC, IME Resources, LLC re10 Civil New Case Documents for DAD. (Javadizadeh, Sheereen)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/10 3:12 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Patricia Matias on behalf of IME Resources, LLC. Attorney Matias, Patricia added. (Matias, Patricia)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/10 11:25 AM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sheereen Javadizadeh on behalf of Examworks Compliance Solutions, LLC, Examworks Group, LLC, Examworks, LLC, IME Resources, LLC. Attorney Javadizadeh, Sheereen added. (Javadizadeh, Sheereen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
11 11 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Thu 01/09 2:40 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Norton, Leo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
10 10 misc Civil New Case Documents for DAD Wed 01/08 8:11 AM
AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/9/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Deputy Clerk VLK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
9 9 misc Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case Wed 01/08 8:10 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:24-cv-3736 DAD CKD. (Deputy Clerk VLK)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
8 8 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Mon 01/06 1:06 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Herman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/06 10:12 AM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Trevor Girard Moran on behalf of Arden Whips. Attorney Moran, Trevor Girard added. (Moran, Trevor)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/06 10:11 AM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sergio Julian Puche, I on behalf of Arden Whips. Attorney Puche, Sergio Julian added. (Puche, Sergio)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/06 10:09 AM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jeffrey S. Herman on behalf of Arden Whips. Attorney Herman, Jeffrey S. added. (Herman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/06 10:07 AM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Aparajit Bhowmik on behalf of Arden Whips. Attorney Bhowmik, Aparajit added. (Bhowmik, Aparajit)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider Fri 12/27 8:35 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Lopez, K)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
Thursday, December 26, 2024
2 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by All Defendants. (Norton, Leo)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 24CV023863 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11944401) (Norton, Leo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Leo P. Norton ,
Att: 2 Declaration of Wesley Marick ,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet