California Southern District Court
Judge:Roger T Benitez
Referred: Steve B Chu
Case #: 3:24-cv-02458
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12102 Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA) Disability Definition
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2024
Terminated:Jan 24, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 10, 2025 12:38 AM PST
Defendant
Lotus Signature Hotels Inc.
Plaintiff
Theresa Brooke
Represented By
Peter Kristofer Strojnik
Law Offices Of Peter Strojnik
contact info


Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago
Sunday, January 26, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Sun 01/26 12:23 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Theresa Brooke (Strojnik, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
5 5 order Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 01/22 12:13 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Lotus Signature Hotels Inc. (jpp)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Request for Entry of Clerk Default Wed 01/22 10:43 AM
Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Defendant Lotus Signature Hotels Inc..(Strojnik, Peter) (jpp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/21 1:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa Brooke. Lotus Signature Hotels Inc. served. (Strojnik, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 12/27 8:56 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (yxc) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/27 8:52 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Lotus Signature Hotels Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19462762.), filed by Theresa Brooke. The new case number is 3:24-cv-2458-BEN-SBC. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu are assigned to the case. (Strojnik, Peter)(yxc) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet