Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Referred: Lee Ann Reno
Case #: 2:24-cv-00266
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, April 03, 2025
11 11 respm Response/Objection Thu 04/03 10:15 AM
QUESTIONNAIRE filed by Zachary Wade Skinner re:10 BRIEFING ORDER (nht)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
10 10 14 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Fri 03/14 4:17 PM
BRIEFING ORDER: Plaintiff shall have until April 14, 2025, to complete the enclosed questionnaire and return it to the Clerk of the Court for filing in the record of this cause. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 3/14/2025) (nht)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 03/14 4:18 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Fri Mar 14 16:18:22 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/06 11:15 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Zachary Wade Skinner. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ars)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order And Notice of Deficiency Fri 01/24 2:51 PM
SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Zachary Wade Skinner must address the following deficiency: See Order. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). The Court will provide Plaintiff another opportunity to set forth his claims on the proper form, which must be returned to the Court by February 11, 2025. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 1/24/2025) (nht) (Main Document 8 replaced on 1/24/2025) (nht)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Blank Form
7 7 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 01/24 2:42 PM
FILING FEE ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 1/24/2025) (nht) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/24/2025) (nht)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 01/24 2:52 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7, 8. (Doc 7 also mailed to Garza County Jail) Fri Jan 24 14:52:41 CST 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
6 6 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 01/21 3:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Zachary Wade Skinner (nht)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/21 2:59 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Zachary Wade Skinner. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (nht)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
4 4 5 pgs order Order And Notice of Deficiency Mon 12/30 10:52 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Zachary Wade Skinner must address the following deficiency: (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS.) Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 12/30/2024) (awc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Complaint Form,
Att: 2 IFP Application
misc Order Receipt Mon 12/30 10:55 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Mon Dec 30 10:55:49 CST 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
3 3 cmp Complaint Fri 12/27 1:39 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Zachary Wade Skinner. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (nht)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Fri 12/27 1:33 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (nht)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 General Order Concerning Litigation
1 1 qcref Kacsmaryk Fri 12/27 1:33 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] index and to the prior sanctions found within the[LINK:circuit] index.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (nht)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 12/27 1:40 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. Docs 1 & 2 (Copy of 1st page of Complaint also mailed to Plaintiff) Fri Dec 27 13:40:43 CST 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]