California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Patricia Donahue
Case #: 2:24-cv-11168
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause46:688 Jones Act
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2024
Last checked: Monday Feb 10, 2025 1:06 AM PST
Defendant
United States of America
Defendant
Systems Application and Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff
Ryan Burdick
Represented By
Nicholas J Neidzwski
Boatlaw, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
25 25 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/18 9:44 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge George H Wu. As per C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-15, the April 21, 2025 scheduling conference date is taken off calendar. The Court sets the following dates: A post-mediation status conference is set for January 15, 2026 at 8:30 a.m., with mediation to be completed by January 12. The pre-trial conference will be held on March 26, 2026 at 8:30 a.m. The bench trial will begin on April 7, 2026 at 9:00 a.m. (See document for additional deadlines and details). (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
24 24 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 04/17 10:29 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Senior District Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically at the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for Monday, April 21, 2025 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. The Court recommends counsel use a landline without the use of the speakerphone when appearing by telephone due to sound reception. If a cellular phone is used and it causes interference or interruptions, the Court will stop the proceeding and require counsel to appear in person. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
23 23 notice Change of Lead Counsel Mon 04/14 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Change of Lead Counsel changing lead counsel from Nicholas J. Neidzwski to Douglas R. Williams. filed by Plaintiff Ryan Burdick, (Williams, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
22 22 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/09 10:03 AM
ORDER by Judge George H Wu: granting21 Non-Resident Attorney Douglas R. Williams APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Ryan Burdick, designating Jonathan D. Marvisi as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (ak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
21 21 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 04/08 2:54 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Douglas R. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Burdick (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39466315) filed by Plaintiff Ryan Burdick. (Marvisi, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 04, 2025
20 20 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 04/04 11:54 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5, filed by Defendant United States of America..(Anders, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Request: ADR Procedure Selection (ADR-01)
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 04/01 4:14 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan Danny Marvisi counsel for Plaintiff Ryan Burdick. Adding Jonathan D. Marvisi as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ryan Burdick. (Attorney Jonathan Danny Marvisi added to party Ryan Burdick(pty:pla))(Marvisi, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
18 18 attorney Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06) Tue 04/01 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Nicholas J Neidzwski counsel for Plaintiff Ryan Burdick. Changing address to 1440 10th Street, Suite 102-C, Bellingham, WA 98225. Filed by Plaintiff Ryan Burdick. (Neidzwski, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
17 17 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 03/14 11:04 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for April 21, 2025 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than April 14, 2025. See Local Rule 26-1. (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 03/13 11:42 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eric J Kaufman-Cohen counsel for Defendant United States of America. Adding Eric Kaufman-Cohen as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attorney Eric J Kaufman-Cohen added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Kaufman-Cohen, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/12 3:00 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition14 filed by Defendant United States of America.(Anders, Frank)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
14 14 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Thu 02/20 11:39 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant United States of America amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Ryan Burdick(Neidzwski, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 02/19 10:11 AM
ORDER DISMISSING SYSTEMS APPLICATION AND TECHNOLOGIES AND GRANTING LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge George H Wu. The Court GRANTS this motion. Defendant Systems Application and Technologies ("SA-TECH") is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Leave is GRANTED for Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint, in which only the United States is a named defendant. The United States of America will file an Answer within 21 days after Plaintiff files the Amended Complaint. RE: STIPULATION to Amend Complaint12 . (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
12 12 stip Amend/Correct Tue 02/18 12:17 PM
STIPULATION to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendant United States of America.(Attorney Frank J Anders added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Anders, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 03, 2025
11 11 10 pgs order Order Fri 01/03 11:14 AM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
10 10 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 12/30 5:20 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant United States of America. (sh)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 12/30 5:19 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Systems Application and Technologies, Inc.. (sh)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 12/30 5:14 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 12/30 5:14 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 12/30 5:13 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 12/27 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ryan Burdick, (Neidzwski, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 12/27 2:02 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Ryan Burdick. (Neidzwski, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Fri 12/27 2:00 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Ryan Burdick. (Neidzwski, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 12/27 1:55 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ryan Burdick. (Neidzwski, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 12/27 1:46 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38824812 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Ryan Burdick. (Attorney Nicholas J Neidzwski added to party Ryan Burdick(pty:pla))(Neidzwski, Nicholas)
Related: [-]