Maine District Court
Judge:Nancy Torresen
Referred: John C Nivison
Case #: 2:24-cv-00456
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2024
Last checked: Monday Feb 10, 2025 4:28 AM EST
Defendant
GORHAM SAND AND GRAVEL
Defendant
DYLON MILLS
Defendant
MARY KENNETH TARR
Plaintiff
SALLY BLAIS
Represented By
JOSEPH M. ORLANDO, JR.
Orlando & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
26 26 order Order on Motion to Extend Time Tue 05/06 1:00 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Memorandum. Time is extended to May 20, 2025. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 05/06 11:44 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by DYLON MILLS. (BOWEN, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Extend Time Tue 05/06 10:19 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by GORHAM SAND AND GRAVEL Responses due by 5/27/2025. (GINZER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/06 2:24 PM
Reset Deadlines as to9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Reply due by 5/20/2025. (slg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
23 23 respm Response to Motion Tue 04/29 3:32 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,15 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by SALLY BLAIS. Reply due by 5/13/2025.(ORLANDO, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Consolidated Opposition
Thursday, April 17, 2025
22 22 service Summons Issued Thu 04/17 3:18 PM
Summons Re-Issued as to MARY KENNETH TARR. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (cjd)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Motion to Extend Time Thu 04/17 2:52 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. Time is extended to April 30, 2025 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extend Time Thu 04/17 12:29 PM
MOTION to Extend Time Oppose Dylan Mills' Motion to Dismiss(Doc. 15) Assented To by SALLY BLAIS Responses due by 5/8/2025.(ORLANDO, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Extend Time
19 19 service *Service Returned Executed/Unexecuted Thu 04/17 12:24 PM
SERVICE Returned Unexecuted filed by SALLY BLAIS as to MARY KENNETH TARR. (ORLANDO, JOSEPH) Modified on 4/17/2025 to note summons unexecuted (slg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/17 4:15 PM
Reset Deadlines as to9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Responses due by 4/30/2025. (slg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
18 18 order Order on Motion to Extend Time Tue 04/15 10:18 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Extend Time to Motion to Dismiss. Time is extended to April 30, 2025. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/15 2:20 PM
Reset Deadlines as to9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim per Order #18: Responses due by 4/30/2025. (slg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
17 17 motion Extend Time Mon 04/14 5:39 PM
MOTION to Extend Time Memo of Law in Support Motion Extend Time to Oppose Gorham Sand and Gravel's Motion to Dismiss Assented To by SALLY BLAIS Responses due by 5/5/2025. (ORLANDO, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extend Time Mon 04/14 5:35 PM
MOTION to Extend Time Oppose Gorham Sand and Gravel's Motion to Dismiss Up Through 4/30/2025 Assented To by SALLY BLAIS Responses due by 5/5/2025. (ORLANDO, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
15 15 motion Dismiss Wed 04/09 11:36 AM
First MOTION to Dismiss by DYLON MILLS Responses due by 4/30/2025.(BOWEN, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit First Complaint filed in York Superior Court,
Att: 2 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss the First Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 4 Exhibit Dylon Mills Reply,
Att: 5 Exhibit Court's Order dismissing the First Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit Sally Blais Second Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit Dylon Mills Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 8 Exhibit Sally Blais Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 9 Exhibit Sally Blais Letter to the Court,
Att: 10 Exhibit Courts Order dismissing the Second Complaint
Thursday, April 03, 2025
14 14 misc Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement Thu 04/03 1:28 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GORHAM SAND AND GRAVEL. (GINZER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
13 13 order Order on Motion to Extend Time Wed 03/26 3:22 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Extend Time. Time to complete and to file proof of service is extended to June 26, 2025. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extend Time Wed 03/26 1:41 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to Serve up to June 26, 2025 For Defendant Mary Tarr/Blais/Lopez by SALLY BLAIS Responses due by 4/16/2025.(ORLANDO, JOSEPH) Modified on 3/26/2025 remove duplicative language (slg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
11 11 service *Service Returned Executed/Unexecuted Wed 03/26 1:39 PM
SERVICE Returned EXECUTED filed by SALLY BLAIS as to GORHAM SAND AND GRAVEL. (ORLANDO, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
10 10 service *Service Returned Executed/Unexecuted Wed 03/26 1:38 PM
SERVICE Returned EXECUTED filed by SALLY BLAIS as to DYLON MILLS. (ORLANDO, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Wed 03/26 2:58 PM
Set Answer Deadline for DYLON MILLS: Answer due by 4/9/2025. (slg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 03/26 3:00 PM
Set Deadlines: Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Disclosure Statement due from GORHAM SAND AND GRAVEL by 4/2/2025. (slg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 03/26 4:16 PM
Reset Deadlines: Service of Process Deadline 6/26/2025 (slg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 03/25 2:34 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by GORHAM SAND AND GRAVEL Responses due by 4/15/2025. (GINZER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 02/27 10:04 AM
Summonses Issued as to GORHAM SAND AND GRAVEL, DYLON MILLS, MARY KENNETH TARR. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (cjd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons to Gorham Sand and Gravel,
Att: 2 Summons to Mary Kenneth Tarr
Friday, January 24, 2025
7 7 notice Notice Re: Pro Hac Vice Approval Fri 01/24 10:25 AM
NOTICE of APPROVAL by Clerk's Office re6 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Attorney JOSEPH M. ORLANDO, JR for SALLY BLAIS added to this specific case only. (lrt)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/24 10:02 AM
CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph M. Orlando Jr. filed by JOSEPH M. ORLANDO, JR on behalf of SALLY BLAIS (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number AMEDC-3059613.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (ORLANDO, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
5 5 misc Notice of Docket Entry Modification Thu 01/23 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding4 Notice of Appearance: Marked as filed in error by the Clerk's Office. Counsel instructed to re-filed using the pro hac vice event. (slg)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/23 9:42 AM
***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH M. ORLANDO, JR on behalf of SALLY BLAIS (ORLANDO, JOSEPH) Modified on 1/23/2025 to mark as filed in error. Counsel to re-file (slg)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement Mon 01/13 3:47 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SALLY BLAIS. (ORLANDO, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 01/06 1:42 PM
Reset Deadlines : Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Plaintiff's Disclosure Statement due by 1/13/2025. (slg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
misc Case Opening Filing Fee Paid Mon 12/30 11:51 AM
Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMEDC-3048113.), filed by SALLY BLAIS.(ORLANDO, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 12/27 4:09 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cjd)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/27 4:09 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. , filed by SALLY BLAIS. (Service of Process Deadline 3/27/2025) Fee due by 12/30/2024.(cjd)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/27 4:11 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings : Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Disclosure Statement due by 1/3/2025. (cjd)
Related: [-]