Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:24-bk-23519
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Feb 04, 2025
Claims Deadline:Mar 07, 2025

Debtor
Eastern Tile Distributors Corp.
7995 NW 21st St
Doral, FL 33122-1616
Represented By
Ismael Jose Labrador
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jacqueline Calderin
1825 Ponce De Leon Blvd #358
Coral Gables, FL 33134
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 12/28/2024 12:02 AM EST
Friday, December 27, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 12/27 5:02 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-23519 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A45353198. Fee amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF] Fri 12/27 4:44 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $338] (Labrador, Ismael)
Related: [-]
2 2 attydoc Disclosure of Compensation Fri 12/27 4:45 PM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Ismael Jose Labrador. (Labrador, Ismael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 12/27 4:45 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Eastern Tile Distributors Corp.. (Labrador, Ismael)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business Asset) Fri 12/27 5:02 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Calderin, Jacqueline. Meeting of Creditors to be held by Video Conference on 2/4/2025 at 01:30 PM at www.Zoom.us - Calderin: Meeting ID 493 614 6686, Passcode 8686999196, Phone (786) 730-4371 Proofs of Claim due by 3/7/2025. (admin)
Related: [-]