Colorado District Court
Judge:Philip A Brimmer
Referred: Susan Prose
Case #: 1:24-cv-03590
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 29, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 12, 2025 1:55 AM MST
Defendant
Arapahoe Community College
Plaintiff
Darius Navran
Represented By
Deborah Yim
Primera Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
16 16 order Order Fri 05/16 12:13 PM
ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on May 16, 2025. The Scheduling Conference set for May 28, 2025, is hereby vacated . This court notes sua sponte that Defendant moves to dismiss this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), this court finds good cause to delay issuing the scheduling order until after the motion is resolved. See Sandoval v. United States , No. 11-cv-01533-REB-KLM, 2011 WL 3682768, at *2 (D. Colo. Aug. 23, 2011) ("Questions of jurisdiction should be resolved at the earliest stages of litigation, so as to conserve the time and resources of the Court and the parties. Thus, a stay of discovery during the pendency of a dispositive motion asserting a jurisdictional challenge may be appropriate and efficient."). Accordingly, if the motion to dismiss is denied at least in part, the parties shall email[LINK:Prose_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov] within three business days to set the scheduling conference. Objections to this order are due within fourteen days. Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a). Text Only Entry (sbplc4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 05/13 8:17 AM
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/13/2025 re:14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint is GRANTED . Plaintiff shall respond to defendant's13 motion to dismiss on or before May 30, 2025 . For future requests for extension of time, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to § I.G.2 of this Court's Practice Standards, "[a]ny motion for extension of time shall be filed no later than three business days before the date the motion, response, reply, or other paper is due." Text Only Entry(pabsec, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/12 6:06 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand (Doc. 1) by Plaintiff Darius Navran. (Yim, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
13 13 motion Dismiss Mon 04/21 8:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand (Doc. 1) by Defendant Arapahoe Community College. (Gonsalves, Christina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Tue 04/08 11:53 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 04/08/2025, GRANTING Defendant's10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Arapahoe Community College's answer is due no later than April 21, 2025 . Text Only Entry (sjeff)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
11 11 order Memorandum Fri 04/04 2:44 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint and Jury Demand filed by Arapahoe Community College. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/04/2025. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Fri 04/04 2:37 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint and Jury Demand by Defendant Arapahoe Community College. (Gonsalves, Christina)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 04/04 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christina Michelle Gonsalves on behalf of Arapahoe Community CollegeAttorney Christina Michelle Gonsalves added to party Arapahoe Community College(pty:dft) (Gonsalves, Christina)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 04/04 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William A. Rogers, III on behalf of Arapahoe Community CollegeAttorney William A. Rogers, III added to party Arapahoe Community College(pty:dft) (Rogers, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
7 7 order Minute Order Thu 03/20 12:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 03/20/2025. Due to a conflict on the court's calendar, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference previously set for May 1, 2025, is VACATED AND RESET . The Scheduling Conference shall be held telephonically on May 28, 2025 , at 10:00 a.m. , in Courtroom A-502, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall attend by calling 571-353-2301, Guest meeting ID- 868150043. All attendees shall please mute their phone when not speaking and not use speaker phone. Proposed scheduling order (including a copy in Word format to[LINK:Prose_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov] ) due May 21, 2025 . Text Only Entry (sjeff)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order Tue 02/25 4:59 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 02/25/2025. Consent form due April 17, 2025 . Proposed scheduling order (including a copy in Word format to[LINK:Prose_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov] ) due April 24, 2025 . The Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held telephonically on May 1, 2025 , at 9:30 a.m. , in Courtroom A-502, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall attend by calling 571-353-2301, Guest meeting ID- 868150043. All attendees shall please mute their phone when not speaking and not use speaker phone. (sjeff)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
5 5 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Mon 02/10 11:02 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Darius Navran. Arapahoe Community College waiver sent on 2/6/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (Yim, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
4 4 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 12/31 7:22 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/31/2024. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
3 3 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Mon 12/30 8:32 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No summons issued (agryan) Modified on 12/30/2024 to indicate summons non-issuance (agryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Mon 12/30 8:31 AM
Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry (agryan)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 12/29 7:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Arapahoe Community College (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10060084)Attorney Deborah Yim added to party Darius Navran(pty:pla), filed by Darius Navran.(Yim, Deborah)
Related: [-]