Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-04100
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2024
Terminated:Dec 23, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 30, 2024 2:16 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nicholas Carre
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Franklin Santana Lopez (1)
Terminated: 12/23/2024
Represented By
Brian Andrew Kirlew
The Kirlew Law Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/30/2024 2:24 AM EST
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
1 1 MOTION to Seal by USA as to Franklin Santana Lopez. (kan)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal as to Franklin Santana Lopez (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 10/1/2024. See attached document for full details. (kan)
Related: [-]
3 3 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Franklin Santana Lopez (1). (kan)
Related: [-]