New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Nina R Morrison
Referred: Lois Bloom
Case #: 1:24-cv-08808
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2024
Terminated:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 14, 2025 6:16 AM EST
Defendant
Central Government of China
Defendant
Ministry of Public Security of China
Plaintiff
Ziyao Jiang
5628 138th Street
Flushing, NY 11355


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, March 10, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 03/11 10:30 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE, Plaintiff was provided with IFP applications and instructed that, to proceed with each action, he must either pay the $405.00 filing fee or submit a completed IFP application for each action within 14 days from the date of the letters. To date, Plaintiff has not paid the $405.00 filing fee or submitted a completed IFP application in any of these twenty-two actions.Accordingly, the actions are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close these actions and mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff, noting the mailing on the dockets. The Clerk of Court shall not accept any new complaint from Plaintiff unless the complaint is accompanied by the filing fee or a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis at the time of filing. (So Ordered by Judge Nina R. Morrison on 3/10/2025) (SG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Deficient Filing Thu 01/16 9:18 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING , litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days . (IH)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 12/30 2:32 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (KD)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
2 2 Pro Se Consent to Electronic Notification by Ziyao Jiang (KD)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Central Government of China, Ministry of Public Security of China, filed by Ziyao Jiang. (KD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet