Washington Western District Court
Judge:Robert S Lasnik
Case #: 2:24-cv-02158
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2024
Case in other court:King County Superior Court, 24-00002-27940-7-SEA
Last checked: Friday Feb 14, 2025 4:07 AM PST
Defendant
Trax Retail Inc
Represented By
Megan Burrows Carpenter
Jackson Lewis Pc (sea)
contact info
Jessica Cox
Jackson Lewis Pc (sea)
contact info
Michael Anthony Griffin
Jackson Lewis Pc (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Lund
Represented By
Jared C Troy
Skidmore Fomina Pllc (bellevue)
contact info
Kaitlyn Moran Gould
Skidmore Fomina Pllc (seattle)
contact info
Gregory M Skidmore
Skidmore & Fomina, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
15 15 order RSL Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates (FORM) Tue 02/04 8:45 AM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 5-7 days. Bench Trial is set for 2/2/2026 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joinder of Parties due by 3/21/2025, Amended Pleadings due by 8/6/2025, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/6/2025, Discovery completed by 10/6/2025, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 10/20/2025, Dispositive motions due by 11/4/2025, Motions in Limine due by 1/5/2026, Pretrial Order due by 1/21/2026, Trial briefs and trial exhibits to be submitted by 1/28/2026. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (VE)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
14 14 misc Joint Status Report Mon 02/03 2:27 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5. (Gould, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/22 9:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jessica Cox on behalf of Defendant Trax Retail Inc. (Cox, Jessica)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Wed 01/22 9:28 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Megan Burrows Carpenter for All Defendants. (Carpenter, Megan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
11 11 notice Notice-Other Thu 01/16 4:14 PM
NOTICE TO WITHDRAW re10 Jury Demand ; filed by Plaintiff Stephanie Lund. (Gould, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Jury Demand Thu 01/16 3:04 PM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Stephanie Lund (Gould, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
9 9 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Mon 01/06 3:15 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joint Status Report due by 2/3/2025. (VE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
8 8 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Tue 12/31 10:45 AM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (AVC)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 12/31 10:32 AM
Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (AVC)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Mon 12/30 3:45 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re:1 Notice of Removal by Trax Retail, Inc..(Griffin, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Verification of State Court Records Mon 12/30 12:55 PM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Trax Retail, Inc.(Griffin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
5 5 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 12/30 12:42 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Trax Retail, Inc.. (Griffin, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Declaration (non motion) Mon 12/30 12:39 PM
DECLARATION of Marcus McCarty re1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Trax Retail, Inc. (Griffin, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration (non motion) Mon 12/30 12:37 PM
DECLARATION of Olga Garcia re1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Trax Retail, Inc. (Griffin, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration (non motion) Mon 12/30 12:24 PM
DECLARATION of Michael Griffin re1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Trax Retail, Inc.(Griffin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 12/30 12:20 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 24 2-27940 7 SEA; Related [+] filed by Trax Retail, Inc..(Griffin, Michael)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8776708
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet