Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Virginia M Hernandez Cov
Referred: Anthony E Porcelli
Case #: 8:24-cv-03003
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2024
Terminated:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 14, 2025 6:30 AM EST
Defendant
Salem's Management Company, LLC
Represented By
Kevin P. McCoy
Carlton Fields, PA
contact info
Mediator
Carlos J. Burruezo
Represented By
Carlos J. Burruezo
Burruezo & Burruezo, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Arwa Tamimi
Represented By
Kyle James Lee
Lee Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
31 31 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 04/23 9:04 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ELA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
30 30 order Order Tue 04/22 3:01 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: On the basis of the Mediation Report's indication that the case has been completely settled (Doc. # 29 ), this cause is hereby dismissed, without prejudice and subject to the right of the parties, within 60 days of the date hereof, to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or request an extension of time, should they so choose or for any party to move to reopen the action, upon good cause being shown. After that 60 day period, however, without further order, this dismissal shall be deemed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any previously scheduled deadlines and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/22/2025. (RAS)
Related: [-]
29 29 adr Mediation report Tue 04/22 2:26 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on April 22, 2025. Hearing outcome: Settled.. (Burruezo, Carlos)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
28 28 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Thu 03/13 3:40 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on April 22, 2025 at 9:00 AM before Carlos Burruezo.(Lee, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
27 27 order Order Fri 03/07 2:46 PM
ENDORSED ORDER appointing Carlos Burruezo as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for April 25, 2025, at 9:00 AM. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/7/2025. (RAS)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Fri 03/07 12:01 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on April 25, 2025 at 9:00 AM before Carlos Burruezo.(Lee, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of appearance Thu 02/20 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Julian C Velez on behalf of Salem's Management Company, LLC (Velez, Julian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
24 24 4 pgs order Order Wed 02/19 2:34 PM
ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/19/2025. (MEJ)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order Wed 02/19 2:09 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order Doc. 22 , no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/19/2025. (MEJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
22 22 order Case Management Scheduling Order Wed 02/12 4:12 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by August 29, 2025. Dispositive motions due by October 15, 2025. Pretrial Conference scheduled for February 12, 2026, at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Jury Trial scheduled for the March 2026 trial calendar in Tampa Courtroom 14B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Conduct mediation by August 29, 2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/12/2025. (GSO)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
21 21 misc Case Management Report Mon 02/10 9:28 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Lee, Kyle)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 02/10 8:18 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Salem's Management Company, LLC. (McCoy, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/07 9:14 AM
Salem's Management Company, LLC's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Salem's Management Company, LLC. (McCoy, Kevin) .(JTM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Thu 01/23 11:48 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: The Court grants the defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file its response to the complaint. (Doc. # 17 ). Based upon the reasons stated within the motion, the Court finds good cause to grant the requested extension. The defendant's response is now due on February 7, 2025. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/23/2025. (RAS)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Thu 01/23 10:31 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by Salem's Management Company, LLC. (McCoy, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
16 16 order Order Wed 01/22 5:19 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by February 10, 2025, file a completed Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/22/2025. (RAS)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons returned executed Wed 01/22 5:04 PM
RETURN of service executed on January 6, 2025 by Arwa Tamimi as to Salem's Management Company, LLC. (Lee, Kyle)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order Wed 01/22 11:18 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel for Defendant has appeared, but Plaintiff has not yet filed the return of service, or proof of waiver, as required under the Rules. Accordingly, Plaintiff is directed to file either the return of service or proof of waiver by January 29, 2025. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/22/2025. (RAS)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of appearance Wed 01/22 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P. McCoy on behalf of Salem's Management Company, LLC (McCoy, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of a Related Action Mon 01/06 9:39 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Arwa Tamimi. Related case(s): No (Lee, Kyle)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 01/06 9:18 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Arwa Tamimi. (Lee, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 04, 2025
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Sat 01/04 7:52 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.03, which requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Sat 01/04 7:51 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), which requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Sat 01/04 7:49 PM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order Sat 01/04 7:48 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The Court is aware of the notice entered in this case, explaining that Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the filing of a uniform case management report with forty or seventy days, depending on the circumstances of the case. However, under Local Rule 1.01(b), a judge can modify or suspend for all or part of an action the application of any rule, except Rule 1.05(a). This Court finds it beneficial to enter a fast-track scheduling order in certain categories of cases before entry of a case management and scheduling order. Additionally, in cases that are not fast-tracked, this Court finds it efficient to have the parties confer and file case management reports within 14 days after the defendant's responsive pleading is due or within 14 days after a case is removed to this Court. In light of this, the Court hereby suspends Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) in this case. At a time the Court deems appropriate, the Court will enter a further order in this case setting either a deadline to file a completed uniform case management report or various fast-track deadlines for the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/4/2025. (MEJ)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Sat 01/04 7:47 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 01/02 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kyle James Lee on behalf of Arwa Tamimi. Lead Counsel: Kyle J. Lee. (Lee, Kyle)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons issued Thu 01/02 12:10 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Salem's Management Company, LLC. (AM)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 01/02 12:01 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Kyle James Lee of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AM)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 12/30 4:31 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:24-cv-3003-VMC-AEP. (RPB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/30 4:13 PM
COMPLAINT against SALEM'S MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22864264) filed by Arwa Tamimi.(Lee, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons SALEM'S MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC.