Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:James L Graham
Referred: Kimberly A Jolson
Case #: 2:24-cv-04314
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 14, 2025 7:08 AM EST
Defendant
Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
4400 Easton Commons Way, Ste 125
Columbus, OH 43219
Defendant
Hamilton Capital Management, Inc.
5025 Arlington Centre Blvd, Ste 300
Columbus, OH 43220
Represented By
Olivia LeRoux
Ub Greensfelder LLP
contact info
Andrew William Owen
Ub Greensfelder LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel J Means
3459 64th Avenue
Seattle, WA 98116
Represented By
Andrew Jay Lichtman
Wesp Barwell
contact info
Jud R Mauger
Wesp Barwell LLC
contact info
Jessica A. Barwell
Wesp Barwell, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/04 10:19 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Hamilton Capital Management, Inc.. (Owen, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Third Party Representative Address Authorization
Friday, March 21, 2025
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/21 2:49 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Daniel J Means. (Lichtman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/20 11:03 AM
ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 3/20/25. (ds)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
15 15 misc Stipulation Fri 03/14 4:44 PM
STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS by Defendant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.. (Wise, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Proposed Order
Monday, March 03, 2025
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 03/03 12:53 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. answer due 3/14/2025. (er)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
14 14 misc Stipulation Fri 02/28 5:37 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Defendant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.. (Wise, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Proposed Order to Extend Time for Schwab to Respond to Complaint
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/28 5:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Thomas Wise for Defendant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (Wise, Matthew)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 02/28 2:31 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Hamilton Capital Management, Inc.. (Owen, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
11 11 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 02/26 2:58 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2025 is VACATED . Discovery due by 12/31/2025; Dispositive motions due by 1/31/2026; Primary Expert due by 8/15/2025; Rebuttal Expert due by 9/15/2025; Settlement Demand due by 12/31/2025; Response to Settlement Demand due by 1/31/2026; Case is referred to Mediation in 3/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/26/2025. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
10 10 misc Rule 26(f) Report Tue 02/25 2:05 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Hamilton Capital Management, Inc.. (Owen, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 02/04 12:30 PM
ORDER granting8 Plaintiff's Motion of Co-Counsel to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jessica A. Barwell terminated as counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/4/25. (sem)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
8 8 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 02/03 11:50 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Daniel J Means. (Barwell, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, January 13, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 01/13 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2025 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/10 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia LeRoux for Defendant Hamilton Capital Management, Inc. (LeRoux, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/08 4:52 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. on 12/30/2024, answer due 2/28/2025. (Lichtman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/08 4:49 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Hamilton Capital Management, Inc. on 12/30/2024, answer due 2/28/2025. (Lichtman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/02 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica A. Barwell for Plaintiff Daniel J Means (Barwell, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/30 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Jay Lichtman for Plaintiff Daniel J Means (Lichtman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 31 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/30 2:41 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10307041), filed by Daniel J Means. (Mauger, Jud)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E