Vermont District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Lanthier
Case #: 2:24-cv-01513
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 14, 2025 6:40 AM EST
Defendant
Jane Lazorchak
Montpelier, VT 05620
Defendant
Julie Moore
Montpelier, VT 05620
Plaintiff
American Petroleum Institute
Represented By
Matthew B. Byrne, Esq.
Gravel & Shea PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Represented By
Matthew B. Byrne, Esq.
Gravel & Shea PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
33 33 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 05/21 1:52 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Matthew B. Frederick filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American Petroleum Institute(Byrne, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 16, 2025
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/16 8:40 PM
STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Julie Moore, Jane Lazorchak(Rose, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
31 31 cmp Intervenor Complaint Wed 05/07 7:08 PM
INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of Missouri, State of Wyoming, State of Ohio, State of North Dakota, State of Alabama, State of Montana, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of West Virginia, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Florida, State of Utah, State of Oklahoma, State of Nebraska, State of Alaska, State of Georgia, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, State of Idaho, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Indiana. (Toensing, Brady)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
30 30 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/05 4:39 PM
ORDER granting28 Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Michael W. Kirk, Adam P. Laxalt, Megan M. Wold and Bradley L. Larson. Signed by District Judge Mary Kay Lanthier on 5/5/2025. (This is a text-only Order.) (kap)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
29 29 order Order on Motion to Intervene Fri 05/02 2:07 PM
ORDER granting27 Stipulated Motion to Intervene. Intervenor-Plaintiffs should file their complaint within 7 days. Signed by District Judge Mary Kay Lanthier on 5/2/2025. (This is a text-only Order.) (kap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
28 28 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/01 5:46 PM
MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Michael W. Kirk, Adam P. Laxalt, Megan M. Wold, Bradley L. Larson (Filing fee $ 600 receipt number AVTDC-2069293) filed by State of West Virginia, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of Wyoming(Toensing, Brady)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit
27 27 motion Intervene Thu 05/01 5:37 PM
STIPULATED MOTION to Intervene filed by State of West Virginia, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of Wyoming(Toensing, Brady)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Attachment
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/01 5:30 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brady C. Toensing, Esq on behalf of State of West Virginia, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of Wyoming.(Toensing, Brady)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
25 25 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/28 3:09 PM
REPLY to Response to19 MOTION to Intervene by NOFA VT and Conservation Law Foundation filed by Northeast Organic Farming Association of Vermont. (Asay, Bridget)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/14 5:43 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION to Intervene by NOFA VT and Conservation Law Foundation filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American Petroleum Institute. (Byrne, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
23 23 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/01 1:58 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mitchell S. Bernard. Signed by District Judge Mary Kay Lanthier on 4/1/2025. (This is a text-only Order.) (kap)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/01 1:38 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Adeline S. Rolnick. Signed by District Judge Mary Kay Lanthier on 4/1/2025. (This is a text-only Order.) (kap) Corrected text on 4/1/2025 (kp)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
21 21 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/31 4:24 PM
STIPULATED MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Mitchell S. Bernard (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number AVTDC-2053123) filed by Northeast Organic Farming Association of Vermont (Asay, Bridget) Modified on 3/31/2025 to clarify text/attachments (sjl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Mitchell S. Bernard,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing
20 20 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/31 4:22 PM
STIPULATED MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Adeline Rolnick (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number AVTDC-2053121) filed by Northeast Organic Farming Association of Vermont (Asay, Bridget) Modified on 3/31/2025 to clarify text/attachments (sjl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Adeline S. Rolnick,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing
19 19 motion Intervene Mon 03/31 4:18 PM
MOTION to Intervene by NOFA VT and Conservation Law Foundation with Request for Oral Argument/Hearing filed by Northeast Organic Farming Association of Vermont(Asay, Bridget)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 3 Corporate Disclosure,
Att: 4 Declaration of Rolnick,
Att: 5 Declaration of Oedel,
Att: 6 Declaration of Jones,
Att: 7 Declaration of Daly,
Att: 8 Declaration of Bissex,
Att: 9 Declaration of Hamilton,
Att: 10 Declaration of Malgeri,
Att: 11 Declaration of Palmer,
Att: 12 Declaration of Trautz
Thursday, March 20, 2025
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 03/20 3:59 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting17 Stipulated Motion to Set Briefing Schedule re1 Complaint. Responsive pleading or Motion to Dismiss due by 5/19/2025. Signed by District Judge Mary Kay Lanthier on 3/20/2025. (kp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 03/19 7:01 PM
STIPULATED MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule re1 Complaint, filed by Julie Moore, Jane Lazorchak(Rose, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/13 9:26 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hannah W. Yindra, Esq on behalf of Julie Moore, Jane Lazorchak.(Yindra, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/12 2:19 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura B. Murphy, Esq on behalf of Julie Moore, Jane Lazorchak.(Murphy, Laura)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/12 2:17 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick T. Gaudet, Esq on behalf of Julie Moore, Jane Lazorchak.(Gaudet, Patrick)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/12 2:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan T. Rose, Esq on behalf of Julie Moore, Jane Lazorchak.(Rose, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/07 9:50 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Steven P. Lehotsky, Scott A. Keller, Michael B. Schon, Matthew H. Frederick, Jared B. Magnuson and Meredith R. Criner. Signed by District Judge Mary Kay Lanthier on 3/7/2025. (This is a text-only Order.) (kap)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/07 9:47 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Jennifer B. Dickey, Kevin R. Palmer and Ryan Meyers. Signed by District Judge Mary Kay Lanthier on 3/7/2025. (This is a text-only Order.) (kap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
10 10 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/04 2:44 PM
MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer B. Dickey, Kevin R. Palmer, Ryan Meyers (Filing fee $ 450 receipt number AVTDC-2040829) filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American Petroleum Institute(Byrne, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jennifer B. Dickey,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Kevin R. Palmer,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Ryan Meyers,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Jennifer B. Dickey Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Kevin R. Palmer Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Ryan Meyers Certificate of Good Standing
9 9 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/04 2:38 PM
MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Steven P. Lehotsky, Scott A. Keller, Michael B. Schon, Matthew H. Frederick, Jared B. Magnuson, Meredith R. Criner (Filing fee $ 900 receipt number AVTDC-2040818) filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American Petroleum Institute(Byrne, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Steven P. Lehotsky,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Scott A. Keller,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Michael B. Schon,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Matthew H. Fredericfk,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Jared B. Magnuson,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Meredith R. Criner,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - Steven P. Lehotsky Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Scott A. Keller Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - Michael B. Schon Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 - Matthew H. Frederick Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 - Jared B. Magnuson Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 - Meredith R. Criner Certificate of Good Standing
Monday, March 03, 2025
8 8 service Summons (re: complaint) Returned Executed Mon 03/03 4:24 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Jane Lazorchak served on 2/26/2025, answer due 3/19/2025.(Byrne, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Summons to Jane Lazorchak
7 7 service Summons (re: complaint) Returned Executed Mon 03/03 4:23 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Julie Moore served on 2/26/2025, answer due 3/19/2025.(Byrne, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Summons to Julie Moore
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 01/07 11:10 AM
ISSUED Summons as to Jane Lazorchak. (kp)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 01/07 11:10 AM
ISSUED Summons as to Julie Moore. (kp)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) Tue 01/07 10:38 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re:1 Complaint and Attachment #1 Civil Cover Sheet. The main document has been replaced to add the case number. Attachment #1 has been replaced to remove page 2. The corrected documents are now attached to1 as well as this entry. (kp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 12/31 5:10 PM
CASE assigned to District Judge Mary Kay Lanthier. (law)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/30 5:08 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American Petroleum Institute (Byrne, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 66 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/30 5:05 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American Petroleum Institute. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AVTDC-2013740)(Byrne, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons to Moore,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons to Lazorchak