California Eastern District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Thurston
Referred: Erica P Grosjean
Case #: 1:24-cv-01600
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause33:1365 Environmental Matters
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 27, 2025 3:01 AM PST
Defendant
California High-Speed Rail Authority
Defendant
Ian Choudri
Represented By
Matthew Thomas Struhar
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Center Point LLC
Represented By
Jay A. Christofferson
Wanger Jones Helsley PC
contact info
Nicolas R. Cardella
Wanger Jones Helsley PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
19 19 respm Opposition to Motion Thu 05/08 6:38 PM
OPPOSITION by Center Point LLC to17 Motion to Dismiss,.(Christofferson, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Kinsland Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Nicolas Cardella
Monday, May 05, 2025
18 18 misc Exhibit Mon 05/05 2:03 PM
EXHIBIT A by Center Point LLC re16 Amended Complaint. (Christofferson, Jay)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
17 17 motion Dismiss Thu 04/24 4:14 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by Ian Choudri. Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston.(Perlmutter, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Points and Authorities Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Defendant Ian Choudri in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Declaration Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/25 5:03 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against California High-Speed Rail Authority, Ian Choudri by Center Point LLC.(Christofferson, Jay)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
15 15 misc Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction Thu 03/13 11:14 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Sarah M. Lucey re12 Notice: Attorney Sarah M. Lucey is directed to submit Petition to Practice in the Eastern District of California through PACER. (Deputy Clerk CM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
14 14 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 03/12 2:14 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on March 12, 2025. (Deputy Clerk FMN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
13 13 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 03/11 7:07 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Ian Choudri. (Struhar, Matthew)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/11 6:54 PM
NOTICE of Association of Counsel on Behalf of Defendant Choudri by Ian Choudri. (Struhar, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
11 11 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 02/28 11:22 AM
MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on February 28, 2025: On February 27, 2025, the parties filed a joint stipulation stating that Defendant intends to file a motion to dismiss and requesting to vacate the Court's April 8, 2025, scheduling conference and associated deadlines, including parties' March 18 deadline to meet under Rule 26(f). (ECF No.10 ). In light of the parties' stipulation, the Court VACATES the scheduling conference set for April 8, 2025, before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean, and VACATES the requirements related to the conference, such as the parties' March 18 deadline to meet under Rule 26(f) and deadline to file a joint scheduling report. (ECF No.3 ). Within ten days after the issuance of the ruling on the motion to dismiss, should the matter go forward, the parties are directed to contact Courtroom Deputy Felicia Navarro ( fnavarro@caed.uscourts.gov ) to secure a new scheduling conference date. (Text Only Entry) (Deputy Clerk FMN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
10 10 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 02/27 4:45 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER TO VACATE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ALL ASSOCIATED DEADLINES by Ian Choudri. (Struhar, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/26 10:26 AM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Matthew Thomas Struhar on behalf of Ian Choudri. (Struhar, Matthew)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/26 10:24 AM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Matthew Thomas Struhar on behalf of Ian Choudri. Attorney Struhar, Matthew Thomas added. (Struhar, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
7 7 service Certificate / Proof of Service Tue 02/04 8:16 AM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Center Point LLC. (Christofferson, Jay)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
6 6 service Summons Thu 01/16 8:26 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ian Choudri* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jay A. Christofferson* *Wanger Jones Helsley PC* *265 E. River Park Circle, Suite 310* *Fresno, CA 93720*. (Deputy Clerk TEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 01/15 5:14 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ian Choudri, Ian Choudri, in his official capacity as Chief Executive Officer of the California High-Speed Rail Authority by Center Point LLC.(Christofferson, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Amended Civil Cover Sheet
Friday, January 03, 2025
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/03 9:27 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: California High-Speed Rail Authority served on 1/2/2025, answer due 1/23/2025. (Christofferson, Jay)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for JLT Mon 12/30 4:00 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Flores, E)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
2 2 service Summons Mon 12/30 3:58 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *California High-Speed Rail Authority* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jay A. Christofferson* *Wanger Jones Helsley PC* *265 E. River Park Circle, Suite 310* *Fresno, CA 93720*. (Flores, E)
Related: [-]
1 1 32 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/30 11:39 AM
COMPLAINT for Civil Penalties, Declaratory, and Injunctive Relief Based on Violations of the Clean Water Act against California High-Speed Rail Authority by Center Point LLC. Attorney Christofferson, Jay A. added. (Christofferson, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc CAED Receipt Mon 12/30 11:51 AM
RECEIPT number ACAEDC-11948412 for the filing fee in the amount of $405.00 paid on 12/30/2024 by Jay A. Christofferson. (Marrujo, C)
Related: [-]