Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Michael L Brown
Referred: John K Larkins, III
Case #: 1:24-cv-05979
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Dec 29, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 12, 2025 4:22 AM EST
Defendant
General Mills Operations, LLC
Represented By
Allegra J. Lawrence
Krevolin & Horst, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Lawrence & Bundy, LLC
Plaintiff
Joshua Sullivan
Represented By
Douglas Dean
Dean Thaxton, LLC
contact info
Linda Carpenter
The Brosnahan Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
17 17 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 05/12 3:37 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by General Mills Operations, LLC.(Lawrence, Allegra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint
Thursday, April 10, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 04/11 10:32 AM
ORDER. Defendant's10 motion to dismiss is DEEMED MOOT, without prejudice to the arguments contained in it. Should Defendant move to dismiss the amended complaint, it should present arguments in a brief and not simply incorporate by reference prior arguments raised in any earlier motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on this 10th day of April, 2025. (pdt)
Related: [-]
15 15 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Fri 04/11 9:09 AM
AMENDED SECOND OMNIBUS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. The Court AMENDS Paragraph E of the Court's Second Omnibus Case Management Consent Orders (See order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on this 10th day of April, 2025. (pdt)
Related: [-]
14 14 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 04/10 3:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III: A Scheduling Conference was held on 4/10/2025. The Court will enter a modified scheduling order. (Tape #Zoom) (pdt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Wed 04/09 9:59 AM
NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE Hearing: A conference is set for 4/10/2025 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins III, via Zoom. (lg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/08 9:34 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joshua Sullivan. (Dean, Douglas)
Related: [-]
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/08 9:33 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against General Mills Operations, LLCwith Jury Demand filed by Joshua Sullivan.(Dean, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
11 11 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Mon 03/31 3:03 PM
OMNIBUS CASE MANAGEMENT CONSENT ORDER. Before the Court is the parties' joint motion for their second proposed omnibus case management consent order. For good cause shown and in the interests of judicial economy, the preservation of resources, and efficient case management, the Court GRANTS the parties' joint motion and hereby ORDERS: (See order for details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 3/31/2025. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 03/18 4:10 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by General Mills Operations, LLC.(Lawrence, Allegra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss
Friday, March 14, 2025
9 9 misc Leave of Absence Fri 03/14 5:22 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 7, 2025 through April 11, 2025 and June 2, 2025 through June 20, 2025, by Allegra J. Lawrence. (Lawrence, Allegra)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
8 8 13 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Mon 02/03 2:13 PM
OMNIBUS CASE MANAGEMENT CONSENT ORDER. Before the Court is the parties' joint motion for their proposed omnibus case management consent order. For good cause shown and in the interests of judicial economy, the preservation of resources, and efficient case management, the Court GRANTS the parties' joint motion and hereby ORDERS: (See order for details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 2/3/2025. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
7 7 motion For Order Fri 01/31 4:50 PM
Joint MOTION for Order with Brief In Support by General Mills Operations, LLC.(Lawrence, Allegra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Omnibus Case Management Consent Order
Friday, January 24, 2025
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/24 1:45 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Mills Operations, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Mills, Inc. for General Mills Operations, LLC. (Lawrence, Allegra)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Fri 01/24 1:37 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by General Mills Operations, LLC.(Lawrence, Allegra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 01/24 1:41 PM
ORDER by docket entry only granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. General Mills Operations, LLC's Answer is due 2/7/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 1/24/2025. (lg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Tue 01/07 8:33 AM
Return of Service Executed by Joshua Sullivan. General Mills Operations, LLC served on 1/3/2025, answer due 1/24/2025. (Dean, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/30 1:55 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joshua Sullivan. (Dean, Douglas)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 12/30 1:35 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to General Mills Operations, LLC. (gww)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 29, 2024
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/30 1:34 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13954176) filed by Joshua Sullivan.(gww) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (gww).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (12/30/2024) Civil Cover Sheet