Original Case: 2:24-cv-06702

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-03369
Typecivil / private / other civil
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2024
Terminated:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 20, 2025 4:19 AM EST
Defendant
SUSAN GOOD, Complainants, et al by and through Jessica L. Vanderkam and Lindsay P. Garrels, Esq., Counsel for Complainants
Defendant
LARRY GOOD, Complainants, et al by and through Jessica L. Vanderkam and Lindsay P. Garrels, Esq., Counsel for Complainants
Plaintiff - Appellant
BRIAN TROY WOLTZ, Grantee, Grantor/Settlor, Beneficiary, Orator, Petitioner
Represented By
Brian Troy Woltz
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/20/2025 4:19 AM EST
Monday, December 30, 2024
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (GCH)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Brian Troy Woltz in District Court No. 2-24-cv-06702. (GCH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1441 pgs Notice of Appeal
Att: 2 17 pgs Supplemental Notices
Att: 3 5 pgs District Court Memorandum
Att: 4 2 pgs District Court Order
Att: 5 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 6 1 pgs Standing Order Excess Pagination
Att: 7 2 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (GCH)
Related: [-]